Blanchard et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Oklahoma Western District Court | |
Judge: | Patrick R Wyrick |
Case #: | 5:25-cv-00320 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2025 |
Case in other court: | Cleveland County District Court, CJ-24-00371 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 3:42 AM CDT |
Defendant
David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ford Motor Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ideal Ford LLC of Oklahoma
|
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Blanchard
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, May 05, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() RESPONSE to Motion re18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Ford Motor Company. (Prosser, Dru) |
|
Tuesday, April 15, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by All Plaintiffs . (Robinson, Brad) |
|
Monday, April 14, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() MEMORANDUM in Support re18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amanda Blanchard(Individually).(Rubin, Griffin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
18 | 18
![]() MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amanda Blanchard(Individually). (Rubin, Griffin) |
|
Tuesday, April 01, 2025 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ORDER granting15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice and granting16 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Bradford John Robinson and Griffin Simon Rubin are admitted to practice before this Court for the limited purpose of participating in this case on behalf of Plaintiff, provided they become properly registered in the Courts Electronic Case Filing System and file an entry of appearance, consistent with LCvR 83.4. Plaintiff's Requests for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Dkts.9 ,12 ) are denied as moot. Signed by Judge Patrick R Wyrick on 4/1/2025. (ekw) |
|
Monday, March 31, 2025 | ||
16 | 16
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs.(Keogh, Greg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by All Plaintiffs.(Keogh, Greg) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 28, 2025 | ||
14 | 14
![]() DEMAND for Trial by Jury by All Plaintiffs. (Keogh, Greg) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Greg S Keogh on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Keogh, Greg) |
|
Thursday, March 27, 2025 | ||
12 | 12
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4659505 by All Plaintiffs. (Rubin, Griffin) |
|
11 | 11
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Griffin Simon Rubin on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Rubin, Griffin) |
|
10 | 10
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Brad Robinson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Robinson, Brad) |
|
9 | 9
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Request for Admission Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AOKWDC-4659485 by All Plaintiffs. (Robinson, Brad) |
|
Thursday, March 20, 2025 | ||
8 | 8
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC . (Prosser, Dru) |
|
7 | 7
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC . (Prosser, Dru) |
|
Monday, March 17, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Ford Motor Company . (Prosser, Dru) |
|
Friday, March 14, 2025 | ||
5 | 5
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Mary Quinn-Cooper on behalf of David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC, Ford Motor Company (Quinn-Cooper, Mary) Document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. Modified on 3/14/2025 (kb) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew L Richardson on behalf of David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC, Ford Motor Company (Richardson, Andrew) |
|
3 | 3
![]() NOTICE (other) by David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC re1 Notice of Removal, Consent (Prosser, Dru) |
|
2 | 2
![]() ENTRY of Appearance by Dru A Prosser on behalf of David Stanley Ford of Midwest City LLC, Ford Motor Company (Prosser, Dru) Document flattened to optimize CM/ECF display; no other changes made. Modified on 3/14/2025 (kb) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Cleveland County District Court, case number CJ-2024-371 filed by Ford Motor Company.(kb) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
misc
Payment for a Civil Case
Fri 03/14 3:57 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4650486. (Quinn-Cooper, Mary) |