New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:25-cv-02130
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:48 AM EDT
Counter Defendant
Englantina Gega
742 Lake Avenue
Greenwich, CT 06830
Counter Defendant
Joseph Gega
742 Lake Avenue
Greenwich, CT 06830
Defendant
Vasilios Lefkaditis
195 West Road
Berne, NY 12023
Represented By
Ryan D. Mitola
contact info
Defendant
Shaw Growth Venture Inc.
195 West Road
Berne, NY 12023
Represented By
Ryan D. Mitola
contact info
Plaintiff
TGISE Capital LLC
individually and derivatively on behalf of Bella Vista Ansonia LLC 29 Valley Drive Suite 5244
Greenwich, CT 06831
Represented By
Justin Edward Proper
White And Williams Llp (philadelphia)
contact info
Plaintiff
153 Main Street LLC
153 Main Street Suite 100
Ansonia, CT 06401
Represented By
Justin Edward Proper
White And Williams Llp (philadelphia)
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
11 11 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 9:02 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (10 in 1:25-cv-02130-RA) Letter filed by Shaw Growth Venture Inc., Vasilios Lefkaditis. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted. Defendants' opposition to the motion to remand shall be due by May 12, 2025 or, if the parties sign the Kentucky Action agreement, within ten days after the mediation conference if mediation is not successful. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due seven days after Defendants' submission of their opposition. SO ORDERED. ( Responses due by 5/12/2025) (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/5/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
10 10 misc Letter Fri 05/02 5:57 PM
FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Ryan D. Mitola, Esq. dated 050225 re: First Request To Extend Response to Motion To Remand. Document filed by Vasilios Lefkaditis, Shaw Growth Venture Inc...(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand Mon 04/28 5:12 PM
ORDER with respect to8 Motion to Remand. On April 14, 2025, Plaintiffs filed a motion to remand this action. To date, no opposition has been filed. No later than May 5, 2025, Defendants must file an opposition or response to the motion to remand. Plaintiffs' reply, if any, is due by May 12, 2025. If Defendants do not file a response by May 5, 2025, the Court will deem the motion fully briefed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/28/2025) (jjc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/28 5:13 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 5/5/2025 Replies due by 5/12/2025. (jjc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
8 8 motion Remand Mon 04/14 3:06 PM
MOTION to Remand . Document filed by 153 Main Street LLC, TGISE Capital LLC..(Proper, Justin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/14 12:51 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Justin Edward Proper on behalf of 153 Main Street LLC, TGISE Capital LLC..(Proper, Justin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
utility Case Accepted as Related Wed 04/02 2:00 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:24-cv-07256-RA. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Wed 04/02 2:02 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 04/02 2:02 PM
Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vba)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
misc Notice Regarding Deleted Document Tue 04/01 12:49 PM
***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 7 ORDER. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. *** As per chambers email, the order should be removed from this case. (tg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
7 7 4 pgs order Order Thu 03/27 3:45 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: [54 24-CV-7256-RA] Letter, filed by Demetrios Zouloufis, George Zouloufis, Shaw Funding LP, Shaw Growth Venture Inc., Vasilios Lefkaditis, Anna Lefkaditis, Richard Rebh, TGISE Capital LLC, Trivantage Management Corp. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted in part. Having considered the relevant factors in deciding whether to stay discovery pending the the outcome of the settlement conference with Magistrate Judge Wang, see Catskill Mountains Chapter of Trout Unlimited, Inc. v. E.P.A., 630 F. Supp. 2d 295, 304 (S.D.N.Y. 2009), the Court finds that a stay of discovery, with the exception of "limited discovery to aid settlement negotiations," is warranted here. Defendants' further application to stay motion practice pending the outcome of the settlement conference is, however, denied. Within two days of the settlement conference, the parties shall file a joint letter updating the Court as to the outcome. If settlement was not reached, no later than one week after the settlement conference, the parties shall submit a proposed case management plan. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/27/2025) (tg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
6 6 notice Notice of Removal Wed 03/26 4:56 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650247/2025..Document filed by Vasilios Lefkaditis, Shaw Growth Venture Inc...(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Summons and Complaint,
Att: 4 Exhibit CPLR 3019d Summons,
Att: 5 Exhibit Aff of Service for Shaw Growth Venture,
Att: 6 Exhibit Aff of Service for Vasilios Lefkaditis,
Att: 7 Exhibit RJI,
Att: 8 Exhibit Court Notice w/affs of service,
Att: 9 Exhibit Stip to Extend TTA,
Att: 10 Exhibit Joint Brief Statement of Facts,
Att: 11 Exhibit Proposed PC Order,
Att: 12 Exhibit ADR (P) atty cert,
Att: 13 Exhibit ADR (D) atty cert,
Att: 14 Exhibit ADR (D) atty cert,
Att: 15 Exhibit PC Order,
Att: 16 Exhibit Court Notice,
Att: 17 Exhibit Affirmation of Service of Notice of Removal,
Att: 18 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 19 Exhibit Amended CPLR 3019d Summons and aff of service
5 5 misc Statement of Relatedness Wed 03/26 4:37 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 24-cv-07256-RA. Document filed by Vasilios Lefkaditis, Shaw Growth Venture Inc...(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Mon 03/17 11:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ryan D. Mitola. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: TGISE Capital LLC, 153 Main Street LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Removal of Party Mon 03/17 11:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING REMOVAL OF PARTY. Notice to attorney Ryan D. Mitola. The following party/parties has been removed from this case: Bella Vista Ansonia LLC. The party was added to the case in error. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Mon 03/17 11:30 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ryan D. Mitola. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to (none); the County code has been modified to Albany; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Related Case Statement Mon 03/17 11:33 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to Attorney Ryan D. Mitola, for non compliance with Local Rule 13 of the Division of Business Among Judges. Attorney must electronically file the Related Case Statement. Use the event type Statement of Relatedness found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading Mon 03/17 11:35 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Ryan D. Mitola to RE-FILE Document No. 1 Notice of Removal. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Pursuant to ECF Filing Rule 13.3, Notice of Removal exhibits must be filed as attachments and labeled. Each attachment must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear. They cannot be labeled "Exhibit A, Exhibit B, etc.". Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 03/17 11:40 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 03/17 11:40 AM
Case Designated ECF. (sj)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Mon 03/17 11:41 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 1:24cv7256 (sj)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Other Fri 03/14 2:43 PM
AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notices of Removal Federal and State served on Agatha Mingos Attorney for Plaintiffs and Engantina Gega and Joseph Gega on 3/14/2025. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Vasilios Lefkaditis, Shaw Growth Venture Inc...(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex P Notice of Removal State Court
3 3 misc Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/14 2:08 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Vasilios Lefkaditis, Shaw Growth Venture Inc...(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 12:23 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 03/14 12:17 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 650247/2025. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30767230).Document filed by Vasilios Lefkaditis, Shaw Growth Venture Inc...(Mitola, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Attorney Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit D,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Exhibit G,
Att: 9 Exhibit H,
Att: 10 Exhibit I,
Att: 11 Exhibit J,
Att: 12 Exhibit K,
Att: 13 Exhibit L,
Att: 14 Exhibit M,
Att: 15 Exhibit N