California Southern District Court
Judge:Ruth Bermudez Montenegro
Referred: Karen S Crawford
Case #: 3:25-cv-00601
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1441ada Removal- Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 27, 2025 2:28 AM PDT
Defendant
Does 1 through 25
Defendant
Oceanside Unified School District
Represented By
Sam G Sherman
Tencersherman, LLP
contact info
Daniel C. Pierce
Tencersherman LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jake Daniels
Represented By
Jessica Klarer Pride
The Pride Law Firm
contact info
Alfred Von Kessler, IV
Pride Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, May 05, 2025
6 6 respm Reply - Other Mon 05/05 5:46 PM
REPLY - Other re5 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Oceanside Unified School District. (Sherman, Sam)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
5 5 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 04/07 9:42 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Jake Daniels. (Pride, Jessica) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 motion Dismiss Thu 03/27 1:57 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Oceanside Unified School District.(Sherman, Sam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authoroities in Support of Defendant's Motion to Dismiss
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
3 3 order Order of Judge Transfer Wed 03/19 3:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro for all further proceedings. The new case number is 25CV0601-RBM-KSC.(no document attached) (jpp)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
2 2 notice Notice of Party With Financial Interest Fri 03/14 9:11 AM
NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Oceanside Unified School District (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/14 9:08 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number BCASDC-19694858.), filed by Oceanside Unified School District. The new case number is 3:25-cv-601-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit