Idaho District Court
Judge:Amanda K Brailsford
Case #: 4:25-cv-00140
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:38 AM MDT
Defendant
City of Idaho Falls
Defendant
Ethan Love
Defendant
S. Nagle
Defendant
Ryan Picard
Defendant
Spencer Wood
Defendant
B. Yorgeson
Plaintiff
Jay A. Jorgensen
Represented By
Jason Wood
Wood Law Group, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 order Litigation Order Thu 05/15 10:05 AM
LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - The Court will conduct a telephonic scheduling conference on June 18, 2025, at 3:15 p.m. mountain time (Boise chambers), for purposes of confirming the deadlines proposed by the parties in the joint Litigation Plan. On or before June 11, 2025, the parties must file with the Court the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Availability Setting Deadline Thu 05/15 8:02 AM
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for City of Idaho Falls, Jay A. Jorgensen, Ethan Love, S. Nagle, Ryan Picard, Spencer Wood, B. Yorgeson re10 Answer to Complaint,3 Complaint, Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/16/2025. (lm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
10 10 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 05/14 11:16 AM
ANSWER to3 Complaint, and Demand for Jury Trial by City of Idaho Falls, Ethan Love, S. Nagle, Ryan Picard, Spencer Wood, B. Yorgeson.(Angell, Sam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 12:09 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay A. Jorgensen. B. Yorgeson served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 12:05 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay A. Jorgensen. S. Nagle served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 12:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay A. Jorgensen. Spencer Wood served on 4/28/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 12:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay A. Jorgensen. Ryan Picard served on 4/28/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/29 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jay A. Jorgensen. City of Idaho Falls served on 4/25/2025, answer due 5/16/2025. (Wood, Jason) Modified on 4/29/2025 to change the date of service per the request of the attorney(lm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued Thu 04/10 3:56 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.)(lm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Summons,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Summons
3 3 cmp Complaint Thu 04/10 12:18 PM
COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against Jay A. Jorgensen ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AIDDC-2910710.), filed by Jay A. Jorgensen.(Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons (City of Idaho Falls),
Att: 2 Summons (Picard),
Att: 3 Summons (Love),
Att: 4 Summons (Wood),
Att: 5 Summons (Nagle),
Att: 6 Summons (Yorgeson),
Att: 7 Cover Sheet
Monday, March 24, 2025
utility Receipt Thu 04/10 3:47 PM
RECEIPT: Civil Bond Fee Fee Received 500.00, receipt #100052946 Paid In Full. (jld)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Bond Mon 03/17 3:10 PM
ORDER - Based upon the foregoing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Set Bond at $500 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall secure and post a bond in the sum of $500 pursuant to Idaho Code § 6-610 within twenty-one (21) days of this Order. This bond is conditional on Defendants right to except to that amount under Idaho Code § 6-610(4). If Defendants file an exception, the Court will consider whether the bond amount should be increasedSigned by Judge Amanda K Brailsford. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (lm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
1 1 motion Bond Fri 03/14 12:30 AM
MOTION for Bond to be Set (Idaho Code 6-610) Jason Wood appearing for Plaintiff Jay A. Jorgensen. Responses due by 4/4/2025(Wood, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration in Support,
Att: 2 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support