California Central District Court
Judge:Cynthia Valenzuela
Referred: Karen L Stevenson
Case #: 2:25-cv-02279
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal -- Other Contract
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, Los Angeles County, 25CHCV00368
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 2:08 AM PDT
Defendant
Nissan North America, Inc.
Represented By
Casey James Douglas
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Aubrey L. Kramer
Shook, Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Rodrigo E Salas
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Amir Nassihi
Shook Hardy And Bacon LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Elmer Y. Amaya
Represented By
Kevin Y Jacobson
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Siyun Yang
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Bryan C. Altman
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info
Danja Stocca
Quill And Arrow LLP
contact info
Andrew C. Jung
Quill And Arrow, LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
10 10 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Sat 04/26 10:54 AM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. Scheduling Conference set for 6/6/2025 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. (iv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 10 pgs order Order Wed 03/26 5:25 PM
ORDER RE MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY BECAUSE IT CONTROLS THIS CASE AND DIFFERS IN PART FROM THE LOCAL RULES. WHEN CONSULTING THIS ORDER, PLEASE BE SURE TO USE THE MOST UPDATED VERSION LOCATED ON JUDGE VALENZUELA'S WEBPAGE. (iv)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 03/26 5:22 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE VALENZUELA by Judge Cynthia Valenzuela. PLEASE READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT GOVERNS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. WHEN CONSULTING THE COURT'S CIVIL STANDING ORDER, PLEASE BE SURE TO USE THE MOST UPDATED VERSION LOCATED ON JUDGE VALENZUELA'S WEBPAGE. (iv)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Mon 03/17 9:54 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 03/17 9:53 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 03/17 9:53 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cynthia Valenzuela and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
4 4 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 03/14 12:53 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by defendant Nissan North America, Inc., re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on March 14, 2025. (Douglas, Casey)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 03/14 12:52 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc., identifying Nissan Motor Co., Ltd.. (Douglas, Casey)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 03/14 12:42 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Douglas, Casey)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 03/14 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California - Los Angeles County, case number 25CHCV00368 Receipt No: ACACDC-39302141 - Fee: $405, filed by defendant Nissan North America, Inc.. (Attorney Casey James Douglas added to party Nissan North America, Inc.(pty:dft))(Douglas, Casey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Answer
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 03/17 10:14 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does, Nissan North America, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Elmer Y. Amaya. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/31/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 ) (lh)
Related: [-]
answer Answer to Complaint (Discovery) Mon 03/17 10:16 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, filed by Defendant Nissan North America, Inc. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 3/14/2025 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL1 )(lh)
Related: [-]