Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:25-bk-10920

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Vincent P Zurzolo
Case #: 2:25-ap-01054
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Jose R Solano
5502 Dobbs St # 74
Los Angeles, CA 90032
Represented By
Jose R Solano
contact info
Defendant
Soledad M Solano
Represented By
Soledad M Solano
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 To 5
Represented By
Does 1 To 5
contact info
Plaintiff
Orange Kangaroo LLC
Represented By
Orange Kangaroo LLC
contact info
Trustee
Nancy K Curry (TR)
1000 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 870
Los Angeles, CA 90017
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (LA)
915 Wilshire Blvd, Suite 1850
Los Angeles, CA 90017


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 1:05 PM PDT
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
4 4 court Hearing Set (Other) (AP Case) Wed 04/09 4:41 PM
Hearing Set Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 6/26/2025 at 10:30 AM at Crtrm 1368, 255 E Temple St., Los Angeles, CA 90012. The case judge is Vincent P. Zurzolo (TJ)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Orange Kangaroo LLC
3 3 notice Notice Wed 04/09 4:38 PM
Notice of Status Conference RE Removal of Action; Filed by Defendant Jose R Solano Related [+]. (TJ)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 2:25-ap-01054. Notice of Removal by Orange Kangaroo LLC . Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (SCX) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2025 (SCX). filed by Plaintiff Orange Kangaroo LLC
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Mon 03/17 5:34 PM
Notice to Filer of Error and/or Deficient Document Other: CORRECTION: Mandatory Notice of status conference regarding removal form not attached to PDF - Form F 9027-1.Notice of removal - Related [+] (TJ)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff Orange Kangaroo LLC
Thursday, March 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Thu 03/13 11:42 AM
Adversary case 2:25-ap-01054. Notice of Removal by Orange Kangaroo LLC . Nature of Suit: (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (SCX) Additional attachment(s) added on 3/13/2025 (SCX)
Related: [-]