California Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stephen L Johnson
Case #: 5:25-bk-50353
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,001 to $500,000
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Tech Rabbit Inc.
1500 Wyatt Dr Ste 3
Santa Clara, CA 95054-1522
Represented By
David C. Johnston
Law Offices Of David C. Johnston
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ
U.S. Federal Bldg. 280 S 1st St. #268
San Jose, CA 95113


Docket last updated: 3 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
32 32 4 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 2:04 PM
Order After Status Conference Establishing Confirmation Procedures (al)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Continued/Rescheduled Thu 05/01 11:48 AM
Hearing Continued Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 08/07/2025 at 11:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. David Johnston appeared on behalf of the Debtor, Paul Leahy appeared on behalf of the U.S. Trustee, Gina Klump appeared on her own behalf as the Subchapter V Trustee and Lane Hilton appeared on behalf of creditor Laddi Jhuty. Debtor to file an Application to Designate Responsible Individual by May 12, 2025. Deadline to file a plan is June 12, 2025. Status conference statement by July 31, 2025. Plan Review Conference will be set on August 7, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. Court to issue an order. (al)
Related: [-] 9 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
court Hearing Set Thu 05/01 2:06 PM
Hearing Set On Plan Review Conference Hearing scheduled for 8/7/2025 at 11:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (al)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
order Judge Docket Order Wed 04/30 8:30 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER (no separate order issued:) This case was filed under subch. V of chapter 11. The San Jose Division of the court has adopted procedures which allow the court to review proposed subch. V plans prior to counsel serving them on parties entitled to notice. This helps to eliminate errors in plans being sent for voting to creditors. In advance of the scheduled status conference, counsel for debtor should be familiar with the courts procedures and the Order After Status Conference. These documents are available on the courts website, under Chief Judge Johnsons Practices and Procedures. See https://www.canb.uscourts.gov/procedure/johnson/judge-johnsons-practices-and-procedures Related [+]. (Johnson, Stephen)
Related: [-] 9 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
Friday, April 25, 2025
31 31 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 04/25 2:33 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Lane C Hilton. Filed by Creditor Laddi Jhuty (Hilton, Lane)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
30 30 order Employ Thu 04/24 3:20 PM
Order Approving Employment of Attorney for Debtor in Possession Related [+] (al)
Related: [-] 27
Monday, April 21, 2025
29 29 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 04/21 11:49 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2025 Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
28 28 misc Declaration Thu 04/17 6:07 PM
Declaration of David C. Johnston in Support of Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-] 27 Application to Employ
27 27 4 pgs motion Employ Thu 04/17 6:05 PM
Application to Employ David C. Johnston as Attorney Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Certificate of Service Thu 04/17 3:55 PM
Certificate of Service of Debtor;s Chapter 11 Status Report Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-] 9 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
25 25 misc Status Conference Statement Thu 04/17 3:45 PM
Status Conference Statement Related [+]. Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-] 9 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
court Meeting of Creditors Continued Tue 04/15 5:34 PM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. Meeting of Creditors Continued . Debtor's chief executive officer Vikram Purbia, Debtor's counsel David C. Johnston, and Laddi Jhuty's counsel Lane Hilton and Ingrid Rainey appeared. Testimony taken . 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/9/2025 at 02:00 PM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. (Leahy, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
24 24 misc Creditor Matrix Fri 03/28 4:53 PM
Creditor Matrix Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 03/28 4:53 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement. Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Fri 03/28 4:52 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor in the Amount of $ Reasonable fees as allowed by Court Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Equity Security Holders Fri 03/28 4:50 PM
List of Equity Security Holders Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 03/28 4:50 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Fri 03/28 4:49 PM
Schedules A-H. , Summary of Assets and Liabilities Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: , Chapter 11 or Chapter 9 Cases Non-Individual: List of Creditors Who Have 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Against You and Are Not Insiders Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/28 10:38 AM
Order Discharging Order to Show Cause RE: Dismissal or Conversion Related [+]. (al)
Related: [-] 5 Order
Thursday, March 27, 2025
17 17 misc Declaration Thu 03/27 1:09 PM
Declaration of Vikram Purbia in Regarding Small Business Documents of Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
16 16 misc Tax Documents Tue 03/25 4:31 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/19 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Order and Notice of Status Conference Chp 11
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Pmt of State and Fed Taxes Wed 03/19 9:13 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Payment of State and Fed Taxes. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
13 13 misc Certificate of Service Tue 03/18 4:49 PM
Certificate of Service Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement Related [+]. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ (Powell, Gregory)
Related: [-] 12 Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond
12 12 2 pgs court Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond Tue 03/18 12:39 PM
Appointment of Trustee and Approval of Bond Trustee Gina R. Klump added to the case. Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee and Verified Statement . (Powell, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
11 11 misc Tax Documents Mon 03/17 4:31 PM
Tax Documents for the Year for 2023 Fiscal year ending 11/30/23 Filed by Debtor Tech Rabbit Inc. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 03/17 1:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice by Paul Gregory Leahy. Filed by U.S. Trustee Office of the U.S. Trustee / SJ (Leahy, Paul)
Related: [-]
9 9 order Status Conference Chp 11 Mon 03/17 12:01 PM
Order and Notice of Chapter 11 Status Conference Status Conference scheduled for 5/1/2025 at 11:00 AM in/via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. Pre-Status Conference Report due by 4/17/2025 (myt)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 16, 2025
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 03/16 9:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order to File Missing Documents
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 03/16 9:11 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+]. Notice Date 03/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Generate 341 Notices
Saturday, March 15, 2025
6 6 order Payment of Taxes Sat 03/15 10:30 PM
Order for Payment of State and Federal Taxes (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
5 5 3 pgs order Order Fri 03/14 5:29 PM
Order to Show Cause RE Dismissal or Conversion for Small Business Debtor's Failure to File Required Documents (al)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Generate 341 Notices Fri 03/14 4:32 PM
Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Meeting of Creditors, and Deadlines (Generated) (myt)
Related: [-]
3 3 order File Missing Documents Fri 03/14 4:31 PM
Order to File Required Documents and Notice of Automatic Dismissal . (myt)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Meeting of Creditors 11 (Business) Fri 03/14 3:42 PM
First Meeting of Creditors with 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/15/2025 at 01:00 PM via UST Teleconference, Call in number/URL: 1-877-991-8832 Passcode: 4101242. Proofs of Claims due by 5/23/2025. (ja)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 03/14 1:36 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual, Fee Amount $1738, Filed by Tech Rabbit Inc.. Application to Employ Counsel by Debtor due by 04/14/2025. Order Meeting of Creditors due by 03/21/2025.Incomplete Filings due by 03/28/2025. Chapter 11 Small Business Subchapter V Plan Due by 06/12/2025. (Johnston, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd none Fri 03/14 1:38 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-50353 ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A33746916, amount $1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)