New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:25-cv-01464
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:45 AM EDT
Amicus
State Of New York
Office of the New York State Attorney General 28 Liberty Street
New York, NY 10005
Represented By
Cleland B. Welton, II
Office Of The New York State Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
The Department of Homeland Security
Represented By
Sarah L Vuong
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amanda Saylor
Doj-Civ
contact info
Lauren E Bryant
Doj-Civ
contact info
Anna Dichter
Doj-Civ
contact info
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Eric Michael Snyderman
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
United States of America
Represented By
Sarah L Vuong
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amanda Saylor
Doj-Civ
contact info
Lauren E Bryant
Doj-Civ
contact info
Anna Dichter
Doj-Civ
contact info
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Eric Michael Snyderman
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Donald J. Trump
Represented By
Sarah L Vuong
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amanda Saylor
Doj-Civ
contact info
Lauren E Bryant
Doj-Civ
contact info
Anna Dichter
Doj-Civ
contact info
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Eric Michael Snyderman
Doj-Civ
contact info
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Represented By
Sarah L Vuong
Doj-Civ
contact info
Amanda Saylor
Doj-Civ
contact info
Lauren E Bryant
Doj-Civ
contact info
Anna Dichter
Doj-Civ
contact info
Luz Restrepo
Doj-Civ
contact info
Eric Michael Snyderman
Doj-Civ
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Michaud
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Nadege Joseph Michaud
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Plaintiff
Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Audoine Amazan
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Rachelle Guirand
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Sabina Badio Florial
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Jean Alix Erinac
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info
Plaintiff
Youdelaine Dorcin
Represented By
Madisen Hursey
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Andrew Tauber
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner LLP
contact info
Alexa Jane Thein
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Daniel Joshua Werner
Just Futures Law
contact info
Ira J Kurzban
Kurzban, Kurzban, Tetzeli & Pratt, P.A.
contact info
Dinesh Keith McCoy
Just Futures Law
contact info
Sarah Levine Hartley
Bryan Cave, LLP
contact info
Raymond Audain
Giskan, Solotaroff & Anderson, LLP
contact info
Geoffrey Pipoly
Bryan Cave Leighton Paisner
contact info
Sejal Zota
Just Futures Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
46 46 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 9:15 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kevin A. Gregg Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-19010267 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Gregg, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
45 45 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Tue 04/29 11:10 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re38 MOTION to Set Aside -- Notice of Motion for Postponement of Agency Action Under 5 U.S.C. § 705 filed by All Defendants. (Snyderman, Eric)
Related: [-]
44 44 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Reply in Support Tue 04/29 10:24 PM
REPLY in Support re17 Notice of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , RESPONSE in Opposition re37 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
43 43 30+ pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Opposition Mon 04/28 4:00 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re17 Notice of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment ,38 MOTION to Set Aside -- Notice of Motion for Postponement of Agency Action Under 5 U.S.C. § 705 , MEMORANDUM in Opposition re37 MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Brief of Amici Curiae filed by State Of New York. (Welton, Cleland)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 25, 2025
42 42 motion Leave to File Document Fri 04/25 5:11 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Document Brief of Amici Curiae by State Of New York. (Welton, Cleland)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae
41 41 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/25 12:11 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cleland B. Welton, II on behalf of State Of New York (aty to be noticed) (Welton, Cleland)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to File Fri 04/25 6:45 PM
ORDER granting42 . The Court grants the states' request to treat this letter as a motion for leave to file the proposed brief. The motion to file the proposed brief is GRANTED. The states shall post a copy of the proposed brief on the docket by 4/29/2025. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/25/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
40 40 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 11:53 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18975313 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud. (McCoy, Dinesh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 4:30 PM
ORDER granting39 Daniel Werner and40 Dinesh McCoy Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as counsel for plaintiffs. The attorneys shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, each attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, each attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/22/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
39 39 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/17 5:58 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18965198 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Werner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
38 38 motion Set Aside Tue 04/15 9:36 PM
MOTION to Set Aside -- Notice of Motion for Postponement of Agency Action Under 5 U.S.C. § 705 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support
37 37 motion Dismiss Tue 04/15 8:30 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Kristi Noem, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, United States of America. Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
36 36 notice Notice(Other) Tue 04/15 8:27 PM
NOTICE by Kristi Noem, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, United States of America Notice of Motion and Opposition Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
35 35 notice Notice(Other) Tue 04/15 8:25 PM
NOTICE by Kristi Noem, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, United States of America Notice of Submission of Administrative Record Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
Att: 1 Exhibit Certification and Index,
Att: 2 Exhibit Administrative Record Pt. 1,
Att: 3 Exhibit Administrative Record Pt. 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit Administrative Record Pt. 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit Administrative Record Pt. 4
Monday, April 14, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/14 11:43 AM
ORDER granting34 Sarah Hartley's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/14/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
34 34 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/11 12:54 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18945074 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Hartley, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice
Friday, April 04, 2025
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/04 11:46 AM
ORDER granting31 Madisen Hursey's Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/4/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
33 33 order Order(Other) Thu 04/03 4:22 PM
ORDER re32 Letter of Agreement Regarding Briefing Schedule. SO ORDERED (including fn 1). ( Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/3/2025 ) (RG)
Related: [-]
32 32 misc Letter Thu 04/03 3:38 PM
Letter of Agreement Regarding Briefing Schedule by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
31 31 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 5:42 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18915868 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Hursey, Madisen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/02 3:27 PM
ORDER granting29 Alexa Thein and30 Geoffrey Pipoly's Motions for Leave to Appear as counsel and advocate Pro Hac Vice for plaintiffs. The attorney shall register for ECF, registration is available online at www.pacer.gov. Once registered, the attorney shall file a notice of appearance to ensure electronic notification of activity in this case. Also, the attorney shall ensure the $200 admission fee be submitted to the Clerks Office via filing the event Pro Hac Vice Filing Fee . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/2/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
30 30 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 6:01 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18911909 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Nadege Joseph Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ. (Pipoly, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
29 29 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/01 5:42 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 200, receipt number ANYEDC-18911835 by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ, Nadege Joseph Michaud. (Thein, Alexa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
28 28 misc Letter Tue 04/01 4:20 PM
Letter Regarding Supplemental Authority in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
27 27 misc Letter Tue 04/01 9:46 AM
Letter in Opposition to Defendants' Request for a Stay of Briefing by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 Email Dated 3/28/25
order Order on Motion for Pre Motion Conference Tue 04/01 9:40 AM
ORDER denying26 as unnecessary as to a premotion conference because it is waived and as to a stay because there is no reason for one. Defendants' arguments in support of a stay are just as applicable as grounds to oppose plaintiffs' motion, and if the Court accepts them (or any of them), it can either deny plaintiffs' motion as premature at that time or defer ruling on it. The Court is not sure what defendants mean by pointing to a potential factual dispute about standing "that is not yet ripe for resolution," but if there is one, thats another ground to oppose plaintiffs' motion under Rule 56(d). Defendants may file their motion to dismiss whenever they wish. The Court would prefer to hear both motions on the same timetable since to some extent they are mirror images and the parties should confer to see if that can be done. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 4/1/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
26 26 motion Pre Motion Conference Mon 03/31 2:54 PM
MOTION for pre motion conference for Defendants' motion to dismiss and request for a stay of briefing on Plaintiffs' partial summary judgment motion by Kristi Noem, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, United States of America. (Dichter, Anna)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
25 25 misc Letter Fri 03/28 6:32 PM
Letter of Supplemental Authority in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (Dkt. 17) by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 2:50 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sejal Zota on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Zota, Sejal)
Related: [-]
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/28 10:52 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda Saylor on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Saylor, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren E Bryant on behalf of Kristi Noem, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, United States of America (aty to be noticed) (Bryant, Lauren)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 4:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luz Restrepo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) Related [+]
Related: [-] strepo, Luz
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/27 1:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Eric Michael Snyderman on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Snyderman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 03/26 1:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah L Vuong on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Vuong, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
18 18 misc Letter Mon 03/24 6:34 PM
Letter re Unsealing of Documents by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
17 17 motion Partial Summary Judgment Mon 03/24 6:20 PM
Notice of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud. (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 Miot Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 Dorcin Declaration
order Order on Motion to Expedite Mon 03/24 10:25 AM
ORDER denying as unnecessary15 Motion to Expedite Pre-Motion Conference. The premotion conference is waived. Plaintiffs may file their proposed partial summary judgment motion. This Order is without prejudice to defendants' right to argue that the motion is premature. Expedition of briefing on the motion seems unnecessary at this point since the time to oppose the motion under the applicable rules is 14 days. In addition, because the Nature of Suit for this action has been stated on the docket sheet as "465 Other Immigration Actions", all filings are under seal pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2(c). The Court does not believe sealing is appropriate given the nature of plaintiffs' claims and will direct the clerk to unseal all filings if plaintiffs fail to provide good reasons for sealing by 3/25/2025. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/24/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
order Order to Unseal Case Mon 03/24 9:20 PM
ORDER TO UNSEAL CASE. The Clerk is directed to unseal this docket sheet and all filings made other than staff notes. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 3/24/2025. (Cogan, Brian)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/21 5:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Raymond Audain on behalf of Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (aty to be noticed) (Audain, Raymond)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Expedite Fri 03/21 5:31 PM
Letter MOTION to Expedite Pre-Motion Conference by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud. (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 03/20 1:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Dichter on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Dichter, Anna)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
13 13 service Summons Issued as to USA Wed 03/19 3:34 PM
Summons Issued as to Kristi Noem, The Department of Homeland Security, Donald J. Trump, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (RG)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Wed 03/19 1:09 PM
Proposed Summons. by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Kurzban, Ira)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
11 11 misc Letter Tue 03/18 5:39 PM
Letter Notifying of Letter Motion for a Judicial Determination of Relatedness by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Letter Motion Request for Judicial Determination of Relatedness
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Tue 03/18 4:42 PM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: The name on the summons does not match the name as it appears on the complaint., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. *DO NOT LIST agencies that you are serving as listed defendants (RG)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/17 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ira J Kurzban on behalf of All Plaintiffs (aty to be noticed) (Kurzban, Ira)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Mon 03/17 12:07 PM
Proposed Summons. by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 03/17 10:06 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 03/17 10:03 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (SDM)
Related: [-]
misc Quality Control Check - Summons Mon 03/17 10:05 AM
Your proposed summons was not issued for one of the following reasons: If multiple defendants, there must me a rider attached to the summons with the name and addresses of all defendants included., Please correct and resubmit using Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
7 7 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 5:24 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 5:23 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 5:21 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 5:20 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 5:18 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Fri 03/14 5:16 PM
Proposed Summons. Re1 Complaint,, by Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Robert Jean Alix Erinac, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Sabina Badio Florial, Rachelle Guirand, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/14 5:13 PM
COMPLAINT against Kristi Noem, The Department of HomelandSecurity, Donald J. Trump, United States of America filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18857639 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Rachelle Guirand, Sabina Badio Florial, Dieu Yolnick Jeune Cadet, Gerald Michaud, Service Employees International Union - Local 32BJ, Audoine Amazan, Youdelaine Dorcin, Haitian Evangelical Clergy Association, Marie Wildrigue Erinac Miot, Robert Jean Alix Erinac. (Tauber, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet