Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:William L Campbell, Jr
Referred: Barbara D Holmes
Case #: 3:25-cv-00298
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Case in other court:Tennessee Eastern, 3:24-cv-00446
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 4:09 AM CDT
Defendant
NPAS SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By
Bethany M. Vanhooser
Spencer Fane LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Christy Saunders
Represented By
Matthew Thomas Berry
Matthew T. Berry & Associates, LLC
contact info
Susan S. Lafferty
Lafferty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 04, 2025
24 24 misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 04/04 3:27 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Susan S. Lafferty admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 04/04 3:25 PM
ORDER: The motion22 to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED. Attorney Matthew Thomas Berry terminated. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 4/4/2025. (sb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
22 22 motion Substitute Attorney Thu 04/03 5:11 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Christy Saunders. (Lafferty, Susan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Mon 03/17 10:54 AM
ORDER: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Lead counsel for the parties shall attend the initial case management conference. This case shall be set for trial upon completion of the initial case management conference by order of the District Court in accordance with the procedures of Local Rule 16.01. Signed by Chief Judge William L. Campbell, Jr on 3/17/2025. (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (sb)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Fri 03/14 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference by Telephone set for 6/18/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara D. Holmes. (mg)
Related: [-]
19 19 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/14 2:36 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (mg)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Fri 03/14 2:35 PM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (mg)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/14 2:35 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (mg)
Related: [-]
16 16 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer Fri 03/14 2:32 PM
Case transferred in from the District of Tennessee Eastern; Case Number 3:24-cv-00446. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Fri 03/14 10:50 AM
ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE: Accordingly, the Court GRANTS the Defendant's "Motion to Transfer Venue" [Doc. 12]. The Court ORDERS the Clerk to TRANSFER this action to the Middle District of Tennessee Nashville Division and to close this Court's file. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 03/14/2025. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Case transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee Nashville Division. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/14 2:56 PM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Bethany M. Vanhooser admitted to this court . (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Fri 03/14 3:03 PM
GA State Bar status verified as active for Matthew Thomas Berry not admitted to this court - Local counsel required . (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - PHV Fri 03/14 3:09 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew Thomas Berry: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall file a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, a Certificate of Good Standing signed by the Clerk of a United States District Court or a U. S. appellate court where admitted, and pay a fee of $150.00 (LR 83.01(b)). PHV due by 4/4/2025. (mg)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Local Counsel Fri 03/14 3:10 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL Matthew Thomas Berry: WITHIN 21 DAYS, counsel shall associate local counsel qualified to practice in the United States District Court for the Middle District of Tennessee. Local counsel shall electronically file a Notice of Appearance (LR 83.01(d)). Appearance by local counsel due by 4/4/2025. (mg)
Related: [-]
transfer Case Transferred Out - District Fri 03/14 10:53 AM
Case transferred to District of Middle District of Tennessee Nashville Division. (CAT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
14 14 ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 2/26/2025. (JCK) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Consent Form
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
13 13 NPAS Solutions LLC ANSWER to1 Complaint by NPAS Solutions, LLC.(Vanhooser, Bethany) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
12 12 MOTION to Change Venue Motion to Transfer Venue by NPAS Solutions, LLC.(Vanhooser, Bethany) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Data from Secretary of State
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
11 11 Now before the Court is the Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint [Doc. 10]. In light of no opposition, and for good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the motion [Doc. 10] . Defendant SHALL file a response to the Complaint on or before February 25, 2025 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Debra C. Poplin on 2/11/2025. (This entry constitutes the complete Order of the Court.) (AGA) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
10 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by NPAS Solutions, LLC. (Vanhooser, Bethany) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
9 9 ORDER. The Court ORDERS the Parties to confer and submit the required Rule 26(f) report on or before February 18, 2025. For the convenience of the Parties, the Court's Judicial Preferences and a Sample Civil Scheduling Order are available at https://www.tned.uscourts.gov/content/katherine-crytzer-united-states-district-judge. The Court will determine whether to hold a Rule 16 scheduling conference after receiving the Parties' Rule 26(f) report. Signed by District Judge Katherine A. Crytzer on 01/27/2025. This docket entry constitutes the complete order of the Court. (CBC). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
8 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Christy Saunders. NPAS Solutions, LLC served on 1/21/2025. (Berry, Matthew) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 30, 2024
7 7 Summons Issued as to NPAS Solutions, LLC. (KMK) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
6 6 Proposed Summons for issuance filed by Christy Saunders. (Berry, Matthew) Modified text on 12/30/2024 (KMK). [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
5 5 Certificate of Corporate Interest by Christy Saunders. (Berry, Matthew) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
4 4 Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/01/2024. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
3 3 Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/01/2024. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
2 2 Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Katherine A Crytzer on 11/01/2024. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against NPAS SOLUTIONS, LLC ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATNEDC-5826646.), filed by CHRISTY SAUNDERS.(Berry, Matthew) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Civil Cover Sheet
District Judge Katherine A Crytzer and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]
No summons received with initiating documents. Therefore, summons not issued as to NPAS Solutions, LLC. (CAT) [Transferred from Tennessee Eastern on 3/14/2025.]
Related: [-]