Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Eli J Richardson
Case #: 3:25-cv-00300
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 04/08 3:45 PM
Proposed Summons to be Issued by Jackie Waldon. (kc)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Judge Mon 03/17 12:27 PM
ORDER : The Order (Doc. No.4 ) entered on 3/17/2025 is hereby VACATED. Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/17/2025. (xc: Pro se party by regular mail. ) (ab)
Related: [-]
4 4 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 03/17 9:26 AM
**ORDER VACATED PER5 ORDER***ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for customized case management in accordance with Local Rule 16.01 and 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). Signed by District Judge Eli J. Richardson on 3/15/2025. (xc:Pro se party by regular mail. ) (DOCKET TEXT SUMMARY ONLY-ATTORNEYS MUST OPEN THE PDF AND READ THE ORDER.) (kc) Modified on 3/17/2025 (ab)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Fri 03/14 2:33 PM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (ch)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Fri 03/14 2:33 PM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (ch)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/14 2:32 PM
COMPLAINT against Jerry Edward Derryberry, Jr, Robin Jean Derryberry, Elizabeth Bryanna Nelson, Daniel Scott Waldon, filed by Jackie Waldon.(ch)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment - Letter,
Att: 2 Attachment - Complaint Verification Information
misc Annotation - Docket Fri 03/14 2:34 PM
Notice mailed to pro se party regarding filing of new case (docket sheet & certificate of service form and Notice of Consent form included). (ch)
Related: [-]