California Northern District Court
Judge:Trina L Thompson
Case #: 3:25-cv-02568
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Case Filed:Mar 14, 2025
Case in other court:San Francisco Superior Court, CGC-25-622265
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 1:46 AM PDT
Defendant
JWP, INC.
Represented By
Mahzad Kazempour Hite
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Angelito Remo Sevilla
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Yuvraj Kakkar
Represented By
Jeffrey M. Curtiss
Jeffrey M. Curtiss, Attorney At Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
12 12 13 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 04/22 4:06 PM
ORDER GRANTING ECF 11 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Judge Trina L. Thompson on 4/22/2025. (tltlc2, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
11 11 motion Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 04/18 2:30 PM
STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Re Protective Order filed by JWP, INC.. (Hite, Mahzad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
10 10 oth_evt Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing Wed 03/26 1:15 PM
CLERKS NOTICE - REASSIGNED CASE - NOTICE OF NEW HEARING DATE: You are notified that the Court has scheduled an Initial Case Management Conference before Judge Trina L. Thompson upon reassignment. For a copy of Judge Thompson's Standing Order and other information, please refer to the Court's website at www.cand.uscourts.gov. Initial Case Management Conference set for 7/3/2025 at 2:00 PM in San Francisco - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Joint Case Management Statement due by 6/26/2025. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/trina-l-thompson/] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (rfm, COURT USER)
Related: [-]
9 9 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 03/26 10:42 AM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned using a proportionate, random and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Trina L Thompson. Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu no longer assigned to the case. Counsel are instructed that all future filings shall bear the updated judicial initials immediately after the case number. Counsel are reminded to verify the location of the judge on the court website. All hearing and trial dates presently scheduled are vacated. However, existing briefing schedules for motions remain unchanged. Motions must be renoticed for hearing before the judge to whom the case has been reassigned, but the renoticing of the hearing does not affect the prior briefing schedule. Other deadlines such as those for ADR compliance and discovery cutoff also remain unchanged. Mark B. Busby Clerk, United States District Court (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (amf, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/14 4:27 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by JWP, INC. identifying Corporate Parent CJX Borrower, LLC, Other Affiliate CJX Intermediate, LLC, Other Affiliate CJX Holdings, LLC for JWP, INC.. (Hite, Mahzad)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Fri 03/14 4:17 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by JWP, INC. identifying Corporate Parent CJX Borrower, LLC for JWP, INC.. (Hite, Mahzad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 03/14 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Action to Federal Court by Defendant JWP, Inc. from San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-25-622265. (Filing fee $405 receipt number ACANDC-20458097). Filed by JWP, INC..(Hite, Mahzad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Mahzad K. Hite in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Declaration of Sarah Gilman in Support of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet