Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine Henry
Case #: 2:25-cv-01329
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Case Filed:Mar 10, 2025
Re-opened:Mar 30, 2025
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 03/31 3:13 PM
ORDER OF 3/31/25 THAT UPN REVIEW OF KENNETH SANTOS-HERNANDEZ'S MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 4) IN THIS CLOSED CASE, IT BEING CLEAR THAT, AS WITH THE SUPERIOR COURT DOCKETING STATEMENT HE SENT TO THIS COURT, SANTOS-HERNANDEZ AGAIN INTENDED TO SEND THIS DOCUMENT TO THE PENNSYLVANIA SUPERIOR COURT FOR CONSIDERATION IN COMMONWEALTH V. SANTOS-HERNANDEZ, K. NO. 496 EDA 2025, BUT THAT HE AGAIN SENT THE DOCUMENT TO THE WRONG COURT, IT IS ORDERED THAT: THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO RE-OPEN THIS CASE. THE MOTION IS STRICKEN FROM THE DOCKET AS IMPROVIDENTLY FILED. SANTOS-HERNANDEZ IS DIRECTED TO CEASE SENDING TO THIS COURT PLEADINGS HE INTENDS TO FILE IN THE STATE COURT. ALTHOUGH THIS COURT FORWARDED ONE PLEADING THAT HE MIS-DIRECTED TO THIS COURT, IT WILL NOT DO SO AGAIN. SANTOS-HERNANDEZ SHOULD MAIL HIS MOTION (ECF NO. 4) TO THE OFFICE OF THE PROTHONTARY OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 530 WALNUT STREET, SUITE 315, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. THE CLERK OF COURT IS AGAIN DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/31/25. 3/31/25 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO PRO SE PLAINTIFF KENNETH SANTOS-HERNANDEZ. (DT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
4 4 motion Amend/Correct Thu 03/27 12:11 PM
MOTION TO AMEND COMPLAINT, filed by KENNETH SANTOS-HERNANDEZ..(sg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
misc Remark Wed 03/19 12:00 PM
document #3 mailed to Kenneth Santos-Hernandez and Prothonotary of Superior Court. (DT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/18 11:01 AM
ORDER OF 3/18/25 THAT THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRCTED TO MAIL THE PETITION TO THE OFFICE OF THE PROTHONOTARY OF THE SUPERIOR COURT OF PENNSYLVANIA, 530 WALNUT STREET, SUITE 315, PHILADELPHIA, PA. 19106. THE PETITION IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THERE IS NO CAUSE TO ISSUE A CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THIS MATTER. SIGNED BY JUDGE: CATHERINE HENRY ON 3/18/25. 3/18/25 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (DT) (dt)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
2 2 notice Notice re: Pro Se Guidelines Fri 03/14 9:20 AM
PRO SE NOTICE RE:GUIDELINES. NOT MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Fri 03/14 1:15 PM
Paper No. 2 mailed to Pro se on 3/14/2025. (ahf)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Thu 03/13 2:55 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by KENNETH SANTOS-HERNANDEZ. NO IFP, NO FEE PAID. (sg) Modified on 3/14/2025 (sg)
Related: [-]