Kevin Alexander v. 3M Company et al
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:25-cv-01088 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2025 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 11, 2025 7:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
E.I. DuPont de Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Thursday, March 13, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Thu 03/13 2:59 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Direct filed (associated as of 2/24/2025), Kevin Alexander v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:25-cv-01088-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Pennsylvania Western (sshe, ) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, February 24, 2025 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-12285449.), filed by Kevin Alexander. Service due by 5/27/2025(sshe, ) |