Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:David L Russell
Referred: Shon T Erwin
Case #: 5:25-cv-00322
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
11 11 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 2:13 PM
ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Plaintiff tendered in this matter. See ECF No. 8. However, the documents remain deficient in the area(s) indicated. The Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above no later than May 23, 2025. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/6/2025. (mc)
Related: [-]
10 10 2 pgs order Order Tue 05/06 1:20 PM
STRICKEN ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Plaintiff tendered in this matter. See ECF No. 8. However, the documents remain deficient in the area(s) indicated. The Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above no later than May 23, 2025. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 5/6/2025. (mc) Modified on 5/6/2025 per11 (mc)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
9 9 notice ~Notice (other) Mon 04/21 2:54 PM
NOTICE (other) by Jason Lee Woodberry(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, April 11, 2025
8 8 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 04/11 2:22 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sason Lee Woodberry. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1 - Trust Fund Resident Deposits,
Att: 2 Envelope
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 2 pgs order Order Tue 04/01 10:32 AM
ORDER re6 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sason Lee Woodberry -- The Court is in receipt of the documents Plaintiff tendered in the above-referenced matter. However, the documents are deficient in the area(s) indicated. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated no later than April 18, 2025. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 4/1/2025. (mc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
6 6 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 03/25 3:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Sason Lee Woodberry. Motions referred to Shon T. Erwin.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
5 5 2 pgs order Order Tue 03/25 12:09 PM
ORDER -- The Court is in receipt of the civil rights complaint Plaintiff has tendered in the above referenced case. See ECF No. 1. In order for this action to proceed, Plaintiff must either pay the $405.00 filing fee or be granted leave to proceed without prepayment of fees. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above no later than April 11, 2025. See Order as more fully set out. Signed by Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin on 3/25/2025. (mc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
4 4 misc Supplement Thu 03/20 2:39 PM
SUPPLEMENT re1 Complaint by Sason Lee Woodberry.(naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, March 14, 2025
3 3 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 03/14 4:10 PM
ENTER ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Shon T. Erwin.. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 3/14/2025. (naa)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Previous Cases Fri 03/14 3:51 PM
NO PREVIOUS Cases (naa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 03/14 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Cody A Carpenter, Payne County Court Clerk, FNU Worthington filed by Sason Lee Woodbarry.(naa) (naa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Att: 2 (3/14/2025) Attachment 1 - Letter