Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Mark Pittman
Case #: 4:25-cv-00286
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Job Discrimination (Race)
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 3:20 AM CDT
Defendant
Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC
Represented By
Talley Ray Parker
Jackson Lewis LLP
contact info
Kshitizraj Sharma Gautam
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Anthony Patrick McNamara
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Mediator
ADR Provider
Plaintiff
Ebony Candler
1910 Pacific Ave, STE 15400
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Karla Rose Connell
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Michelle Mutole Juma
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Elizabeth Jane Sanford
The Sanford Firm
contact info
Brian P Sanford
Brian P Sanford PC
contact info
Yusuf Farhan Buttar
Law Office Of Yusuf Buttar
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
34 34 order Scheduling Order Order For ADR Wed 04/09 4:56 PM
AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: This case is set for trial on this Court's four-week docket beginning April 6, 2026. Counsel and the Parties must be ready for trial on two days' notice at any time during those four weeks. Joinder of Parties due by 6/6/2025. Amended Pleadings due by 6/6/2025. Deadline for mediation is on or before 10/8/2025. Discovery due by 11/7/2025. Motions due by 12/5/2025. Pretrial Order due by 3/12/2026. The court appoints John W Brookman as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/9/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
33 33 misc Status Report Mon 04/07 7:02 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 04/04 3:33 PM
ANSWER to27 Amended Complaint,, filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
31 31 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Wed 04/02 3:49 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER denying30 Motion to Extend Time. Before the Court is Defendant's unopposed motion to extend time of responsive expert designation deadlines. On February 19, 2025, Defendant filed a motion for separate trials. On March 14, 2025, the Court granted Defendant's motion and ordered separate trials for the eight original plaintiffs. On March 21, 2025, Plaintiff filed an amended complaint in this case. On March 23, 2025, the parties were ordered to conduct a scheduling conference to prepare and submit a report regarding contents of a new scheduling order by April 7, 2025. Accordingly, the Motion to extend time is DENIED as moot. The parties shall include a proposed date for the responsive expert designation deadline in their report due on April 7, 2025. These cases have been separated, accordingly, moving forward any motions addressing the eight separate actions together will be unfiled and the parties will be ordered to show cause. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 4/2/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/02 10:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time OF RESPONSIVE EXPERT DESIGNATION DEADLINES filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Sunday, March 23, 2025
29 29 5 pgs order Order for Scheduling Order Proposal Mon 03/24 8:38 AM
ORDER: Lead counsel for each party or designee attorney with appropriate authority and any unrepresented party must confer in an in-person, face-to-face conference as soon as practicable. As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order by April 7, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/23/2025) (jnp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
28 28 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Fri 03/21 3:39 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ebony Candler. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sanford, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
27 27 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/21 3:36 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ebony Candler filed by Ebony Candler. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanford, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet
Friday, March 14, 2025
26 26 3 pgs order Order to Sever ~Util - Terminate Motions Fri 03/14 11:30 AM
ORDER OF SEPARATE TRIAL: Before the Court is Defendant's Motion for Separate Trials. ECF No.18 . The Court GRANTS the motion. The Court ORDERS that this case be divided into separate cases and case numbers for separate trials. The Clerk of the Court shall create a case and case number for each individual Plaintiff. Further, it is ORDERED that Plaintiffs, within seven days of the creation of each case, file an Amended Complaint containing the facts and allegations relevant for that particular case. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 3/14/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 Designation of Experts by Chancy Bell, Ebony Candler, Tim Gooden, Neil Gregory, Jonathan Harvey, Derrick Hooker, Wilfred Jones, Kenton Waites. (Sanford, Brian)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
24 24 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Yusuf Farhan Buttar on behalf of Chancy Bell, Ebony Candler, Tim Gooden, Neil Gregory, Jonathan Harvey, Derrick Hooker, Wilfred Jones, Kenton Waites. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Buttar, Yusuf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
23 23 REPLY filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC re:18 MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIALS (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
22 22 RESPONSE filed by Chancy Bell, Ebony Candler, Tim Gooden, Neil Gregory, Jonathan Harvey, Derrick Hooker, Wilfred Jones, Kenton Waites re:18 MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIALS (Sanford, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration(s) Declaration of Tim Gooden
Monday, February 24, 2025
21 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting20 Motion to Extend Time. Before the Court is Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Extend Expert Deadlines (ECF No. 20). Having considered the Motion and applicable law, the Court hereby GRANTS the Motion. Plaintiffs initial expert designation and report deadline is extended to March 7, 2025. The responsive expert designation and report deadline is extended to April 7, 2025. All other deadlines remain unchanged. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/24/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
20 20 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time Expert Deadlines filed by Chancy Bell, Ebony Candler, Tim Gooden, Neil Gregory, Jonathan Harvey, Derrick Hooker, Wilfred Jones, Kenton Waites (Connell, Karla)
Related: [-]
19 19 ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiffs shall file a response to the18 Motion on or before February 28, 2025, and Defendant's reply shall be filed on or before March 5, 2025. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 2/21/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
18 18 MOTION FOR SEPARATE TRIALS filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
17 17 ANSWER to16 Amended Complaint,, filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
16 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC, Jonathan Harvey filed by Kenton Waites, Wilfred Jones, Ebony Candler, Neil Gregory, Tim Gooden, Derrick Hooker, Chancy Bell, Jonathan Harvey. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (saw)
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ("Motion"). ECF No.14 . Having reviewed the Motion and the applicable law, the Court concludes that it should be, and is hereby, GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 1/6/2025) (saw)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2024
14 14 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint to Add Jonathan Harvey filed by Jonathan Harvey, Derrick Hooker, Neil Gregory, Tim Gooden, Wilfred Jones, Kenton Waites, Chancy Bell, Ebony CandlerAttorney Brian P Sanford added to party Jonathan Harvey(pty:pla) (Sanford, Brian) Modified to remove party Jonathan Harvey until the motion has been ruled and the amended complaint filed on 12/23/2024 (cea).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 First Amended Complaint
Thursday, October 24, 2024
13 13 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2025 in US Courthouse, Courtroom 4th Floor, 501 W. 10th St. Fort Worth, TX 76102-3673 before Judge Mark Pittman., Joinder of Parties due by 12/23/2024., Amended Pleadings due by 12/23/2024., Deadline for mediation is on or before 4/23/2025., Discovery due by 5/23/2025., Motions due by 6/23/2025., Pretrial Order due by 9/25/2025.), ADR Provider, John Brookman, added. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 10/24/2024) (sre)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
12 12 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING CONTENTS OF SCHEDULING ORDER filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
10 10 ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
9 9 Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: As a result of the Scheduling Conference, counsel must prepare and submit a Report Regarding Contents of Scheduling Order (Joint Report) by October 15, 2024. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/16/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
8 8 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Anthony P. McNamara. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 9/16/2024) (chmb)(adf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
7 7 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-14863167) filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLCAttorney Anthony Patrick McNamara added to party Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC(pty:dft) (McNamara, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Good Standing
Thursday, August 22, 2024
6 6 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT5 : Before the Court is Defendant Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint (Dkt.1 ). Having considered the Motion, the Court finds that it should be GRANTED. (Ordered by Judge Mark Pittman on 8/22/2024) (wxc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
5 5 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Lhoist North America of Texas, LLCAttorney Talley Ray Parker added to party Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC(pty:dft) (Parker, Talley)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, August 08, 2024
4 4 Summons Issued as to Lhoist North America of Texas, LLC. (sre)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
3 3 New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. File to: Judge Pittman. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. Attorneys are further reminded that, if necessary, they must comply with Local Rule 83.10(a) within 14 days or risk the possible dismissal of this case without prejudice or without further notice. (sre)
Related: [-]
2 2 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Chancy Bell, Ebony Candler, Tim Gooden, Neil Gregory, Derrick Hooker, Wilfred Jones, Kenton Waites. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Sanford, Brian)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Kenton Waites, Wilfred Jones, Ebony Candler, Neil Gregory, Tim Gooden, Derrick Hooker, Chancy Bell. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-14823702) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Sanford, Brian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet