USA v. Sanchez-Perez
New Mexico District Court | |
Case #: | 2:25-cr-00441 |
Case Filed: | Mar 12, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 3:12 AM MDT |
Defendant
Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez (1)
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
US Probation and Pretrial Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
USA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 5:29 AM MDT |
Tuesday, February 25, 2025 | ||
Arrest of Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez (rh) [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | ||
Wednesday, February 26, 2025 | ||
Hearing as to Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez: Initial Appearance set for 2/27/2025 at 09:07 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth. (rh) [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | ||
Thursday, February 27, 2025 | ||
Attorney update in case as to Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez. Attorney Jared Kirk Anthony Williams for USA added. (ac) [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | ||
U.S. Probation and Pretrial Services added as interested party.(Ramos, Jennifer) [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
2 | 2 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER Darren Robinson for Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | |
3 | 3 Clerk's Minutes of Initial Presentment hearing held before Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth: Initial Appearance as to Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez held on 2/27/2025. Defendant advised of rights/penalties. Attorney to be appointed. Appearances: AUSA: James Andrew Dickens; AFPD: David Benatar ; FPD Standing In; Interpreter: Enith Valdes-Ortiz. Recorded: Liberty-Sierra Blanca. Rights: 10:33 AM - 10:36 AM. Time In Session: 10:50 AM - 10:56 AM. Courtroom Deputy: Kristin Solis. NOTICE OF HEARING: Preliminary/Detention Hearing is hereby set before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez for 3/4/2025, at 09:00 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower), U.S. District Courthouse, 100 N. Church St., Las Cruces, New Mexico. THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED. (ac) [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | |
4 | 4 Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court confirms the United States' obligation to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Failing to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including but not limited to, exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, or sanctions by Chief Magistrate Judge Gregory B. Wormuth (ac) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | |
Monday, March 03, 2025 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Tuesday, March 04, 2025 | ||
7 | 7 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez by Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. The Court having reviewed the waiver of preliminary hearing, waiver of personal presence at the preliminary hearing and request for tolling of Grand Jury presentment and waiver of detention, now finds that the ends of justice served by granting the request to toll the speedy indictment computation outweigh the interest of the defendant and the public in a speedy indictment. The Court expressly finds that the public's interest in a speedy indictment in this case is outweighed by: (I) the public's interest in a reasonably expeditious resolution of the case; (2) the public's interest in relieving the burden that would be placed on judicial, prosecutorial, defense, and law enforcement resources if the case proceeded to a preliminary examination and/or a speedy indictment; and (3) the potential benefit conferred upon the defendant in an expedited resolution of the case. IT IS THEREFORE. ORDERED, ADJUDGED. and DECREED that pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(h)(7)(A), a period of time of 75 days from today's date is hereby tolled and excluded from the computation of speedy indictment. At the expiration of this 75-day period, the 30-day period pursuant to 18 U.S.C.§3161(b) for speedy indictment shall resume. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the preliminary and detention hearings are vacated. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (vh) [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | |
8 | 8
![]() |
|
9 | 9 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Guadalupe Fernando Sanchez-Perez: Change of Plea Hearing set for 3/12/2025 at 09:10 AM in Las Cruces - 340 Sierra Blanca Courtroom (North Tower) before Magistrate Judge Damian L. Martinez. [ Interpreter Needed ](rh) [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] [2:25-mj-00298-GBW] | |
Wednesday, March 12, 2025 | ||
10 | 10
![]() |
|
11 | 11
![]() |
|
12 | 12
![]() |
|
13 | 13
![]() |