Texas Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00065
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 2:24 AM CDT
Defendant
Joseph Krabbe (1)
Represented By
Todd Donald Shapiro
The Shapiro Law Firm
contact info
Michael John Pannitto
Federal Public Defender - Sherman
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Eric Ryan Erlandson
Cooke County District Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 4:46 AM CDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
1 1 SEALED COMPLAINT as to Joseph Krabbe (1). (baf) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
3 3 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Joseph Krabbe (baf) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
Arrest of Joseph Krabbe (kl) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Joseph Krabbe: Initial Appearance set for 2/13/2025 at 02:30 PM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett. (kl) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett: Initial Appearance on a Complaint as to Joseph Krabbe held on 2/13/2025 from 03:04 - 03:13 pm. Attorney Michael John Pannitto (FPD) standing by and appointed for Joseph Krabbe. Govt moved for detention. Dft requested a preliminary and detention hearing. (Preliminary/Detention Hearing set for 2/19/2025 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett.) Dft Location: Custody. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Stevan Buys; Defense - Michael Pannitto. No exhibits. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording) (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
5 5 SEALED CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Joseph Krabbe (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Joseph Krabbe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 2/13/2025. (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
7 7 RULE 5(f)(1) ORDER as to Joseph Krabbe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Aileen Goldman Durrett on 2/13/2025. (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
Reset Hearings as to Joseph Krabbe: Preliminary and Detention Hearing RESET for 2/20/2025 at 09:30 AM in Ctrm A01 (Sherman - Annex) before Magistrate Judge Don D Bush. (kl) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Don D Bush: Detention Hearing as to Joseph Krabbe held on 2/20/2025 from 10:18 - 11:28 am. Govt witness: Kyle Losey. Defense Witness: Cheryl Diane Cheshier Cash. Court finds that defendant shall be released on conditions. Dft Location: Release/Bond. Attorney Appearances: AUSA - Lesley Brooks; Defense - Michael Pannitto. Exhibits admitted. (Court Reporter - Digital Recording) (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Joseph Krabbe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D Bush on 2/20/2025. (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER of Probable Cause in case as to Joseph Krabbe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Don D Bush on 2/20/2025. (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
11 11 FIRST NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Todd Donald Shapiro appearing for Joseph Krabbe (Shapiro, Todd) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
12 12 Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 2/13/2025 in case as to Joseph Krabbe. (knp) [4:25-mj-00047-AGD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
13 13 INDICTMENT (Merged MJ complaint case: 4:25mj47.) as to Joseph Krabbe (1) count(s) 1. (knp)
Related: [-]
14 14 E-GOV SEALED Form AO 257 filed as to Joseph Krabbe (knp)
Related: [-]