Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 4:25-cr-00103
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 2:41 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Salas-Gaytan (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Houston
contact info
Amr Adnan Ahmed
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Elizabeth A Wyman
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 5:52 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
1 1 4 pgs COMPLAINT as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan (1), filed. (pns4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
Arrest of Jorge Salas-Gaytan, filed. (pns4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
***Set Hearing as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan: Initial Appearance set for 2/13/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 703 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray (pns4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
Arrest of Jorge Salas-Gaytan, filed. (jmm4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
INITIAL APPEARANCE Minute Entry for proceedings held on 2/13/2025 before Magistrate Judge Peter Bray as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan. Defendant first appearance on Complaint. (Defendant informed of rights). Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Order appointing FPD to be entered, Defendant waives Preliminary, Detention Hearing and Waiver of Preliminary Hearing, Waiver of Detention Hearing executed, Waiver of Preliminary, Detention Hearing executed on the record, Order of Detention Pending Trial Hearing Waived to be entered. Appearances: AUSA Steven Schammel for USA; AFPD Kurtis Johnson for Defendant.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: Yes) (Pretrial Officer: Yes) Defendant remanded to custody, filed. (jmm4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
2 2 Arrest Warrant issued 02/11/2025; Returned Executed on 02/13/2025 as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (pns4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
4 4 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Jorge Salas-Gaytan, filed. [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
6 6 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
7 7 Order of Detention Pending Trial Waived as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Peter Bray) Parties notified. (jmm4) (jmm4). [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Amr Adnan Ahmed, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan, filed. (Ahmed, Amr) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
3 3 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan, filed. (mw4) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
8 8 Arrest Warrant issued 2/11/2025; Returned Executed on 2/13/2025 as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (dlr1) [4:25-mj-00068]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
9 9 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan (1) count(s) 1, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment Indictment
10 10 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Elizabeth A Wyman appearing for USA, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER for Issuance of Notice of Indictment as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan (Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett) Parties notified. (abb4)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs NOTICE OF SETTING as to Jorge Salas-Gaytan. Arraignment set for 3/21/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 700 before Magistrate Judge Richard W Bennett, filed. (abb4)
Related: [-]