Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00463
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez (1)
Represented By
Rafael Salas
Salas & Salas L.L.P.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Scott Wisniewski
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Apr 03 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mao)
GPO Apr 07 2025
ORDER accepting re 19 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge David Briones. (mao)

Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 5:22 AM CDT
Sunday, February 16, 2025
Arrest of Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez. by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez. (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez. (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL Rafael Salas for Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez appointed. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez held on 2/18/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (L. Quevedo) (Court Reporter ERO.) (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez, ( Detention/Preliminary Hearing set for 2/21/2025 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
Notice of Correction: re6 Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA.AUSA to refile a corrected or amended Notice of Appearance to reflect the acting United States Attorney. (mv) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Wisniewski appearing for USA. . Attorney Scott Wisniewski added to party USA(pty:pla) (Wisniewski, Scott) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
7 7 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez (Salas, Rafael) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Wisniewski appearing for USA. (Wisniewski, Scott) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
9 9 ORDER OF DETENTION: Bond set to No Bond as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (r013) [3:25-mj-00666-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot1)
Related: [-]
10 10 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
12 12 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Victor Manuel Pedroza-Godinez (bot1)
Related: [-]