Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00466
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 3:40 AM CDT
Defendant
Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (1)
Represented By
Jose E. Troche
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Scott Wisniewski
Doj-Usao
contact info

GPO Apr 03 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes. Signed by Judge Anne T. Berton. (mv)
GPO Apr 07 2025
ORDER accepting re 23 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (ep1)

Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 5:23 AM CDT
Monday, February 17, 2025
Arrest of Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
ORAL ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes. (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes. (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING Jose E. Troche as COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert F. Castaneda:Initial Appearance as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes held on 2/18/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (L. Quevedo). (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes, (Detention and Preliminary Hearing set for 2/21/2025 03:30 PM before Judge Robert F. Castaneda), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act. Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (SEALED pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002). (ll) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Scott Wisniewski appearing for USA. . Attorney Scott Wisniewski added to party USA(pty:pla) (Wisniewski, Scott) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (mv) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
9 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Detention Hearing as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes held on 2/21/2025 DETAINED WITHOUT BOND (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), Due Process Protections Act Warning given in Open Court, SPANISH Language Interpreter required (Court Reporter ERO.) (mv) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER GRANTING2 Motion to Detain Defendant without Bond. Detained Without Bond as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (1). Signed by Judge Robert F. Castaneda. (mv) [3:25-mj-00665-RFC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Berton (bot1)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (1) count(s) 1-2. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Consuelo Gomez-Cervantes (bot1)
Related: [-]