Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00479
Case Filed:Mar 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 3:46 AM CDT
Defendant
Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras (1)
Represented By
Nicole Christine Bombara
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
FINDINGS OF FACT AND RECOMMENDATION on felony guilty plea before the United States Magistrate Judge as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mc4)
GPO Apr 10 2025
ORDER accepting re 21 Findings of Fact on Plea as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. Guilty plea accepted. Signed by Judge Kathleen Cardone. (mc4)

Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 5:34 AM CDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
Arrest of Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 13, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras held on 2/13/2025 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required ( T MCENENY) as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras (Court Reporter ERO.) (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING PRELIMINARY / DETENTION HEARING as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras, ( Detention Hearing set for 2/20/2025 02:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,, Preliminary Hearing set for 2/20/2025 02:30 PM before Judge Miguel A. Torres,), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Nicole Christine Bombara appearing for Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras . Attorney Nicole Christine Bombara added to party Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras(pty:dft) (Bombara, Nicole) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras (Bombara, Nicole) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION: DETAINED WITHOUT BOND as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (mao) [3:25-mj-00604-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot1)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras (1) count(s) 1. (bot2)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Jorge Alberto De la Cruz-Contreras (bot1)
Related: [-]