Illinois Northern District Court
Case #: 1:25-cr-00139
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 2:17 AM CDT
Defendant
Mary A. Lecena (1)
Represented By
Keri A Ambrosio
Law Offices Of Keri Ambrosio
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Pretrial Services
contact info
AUSA - Chicago
United States Attorney'S Office (ndil - Chicago)
contact info
Anthony Chmura
Untied States Attonrey Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 4:36 AM CDT
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
ARREST of defendant Mary A. Lecena (smb, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
1 1 RULE 5(c)(3) Affidavit in Removal Proceedings signed by Judge Honorable Heather K. McShain as to Mary A. Lecena (1) (smb, )
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER: Initial appearance and removal proceedings held on 03/13/2025. Defendant appears in response to arrest in this District on 03/12/2025. The Court found Defendant unable to afford counsel. Enter order appointing Keri A. Ambrosio of the Federal Defender Panel as counsel for Defendant. Defendant informed of her rights. Defendant informed of the charges against her in the Indictment filed in the United States District Court in the Western District of Missouri and the maximum possible sentence/fine if convicted of the charges. Defendant waives her right to an identity hearing. The Court finds that Defendant is the individual named in the Indictment filed in the United States District Court in the Western District of Missouri. Government and Defendant agree on certain conditions of release. Enter Order Setting Conditions of Release. Pursuant to Fed. R. Crim. P. 5(f)(1), the Court confirmed the continuing obligation of the United States to disclose information favorable to the Defendant as to guilt or punishment, and possible consequences of nondisclosure. For further details, please see the attached written order. Defendant shall be released after processing. Defendant shall appear on her own accord to answer the pending charges in the United States District Court in the Western District of Missouri, as directed. All pending matters in this case in the Northern District of Illinois are hereby terminated. Signed by the Honorable Heather K. McShain on 3/13/2025. Mailed notice. (smb, )
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5(f): Pursuant to Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the court, with both the prosecutor and defense counsel present, confirms the government's obligation to disclose favorable evidence to the accused under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and orders it to do so. Favorable evidence under Brady need have only some weight and includes both exculpatory and impeaching evidence. Failure to produce such evidence in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including, but not limited to, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, and contempt proceedings. Signed by the Honorable Heather K. McShain on 3/13/2025. Mailed notice. (smb, )
Related: [-]
4 4 FINANCIAL Affidavit filed by Mary A. Lecena (SEALED) (smb, )
Related: [-]
5 5 CJA ORDER Appointing Counsel Keri Ambrosio for Mary A. Lecena Under the Criminal Justice Act. Signed by the Honorable Heather K. McShain on 3/13/2025. Mailed notice. (smb, )
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Mary A. Lecena in amount of $4,500, UNSECURED. Signed by the Honorable Heather K. McShain on 3/13/2025. Mailed notice. (smb, )
Related: [-]
7 7 APPEARANCE Bond as to Mary A. Lecena in the amount of $4,500. (smb, )
Related: [-]
8 8 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Defendant Mary A. Lecena committed to Western District of Missouri, Southern Division. Signed by the Honorable Heather K. McShain on 3/13/2025. Mailed notice. (smb, )
Related: [-]