Louisiana Western District Court
Case #: 2:25-cr-00044
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 2:16 AM CDT
Defendant
Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1)
Represented By
John Mario Piccione
Federal Public Defenders Office (laf)
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Craig R Bordelon
U S Attorneys Office (laf)
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 4:34 AM CDT
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). (crt,Adams, K) Modified sealed status on 3/13/2025 (YocumSld, M). [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Sealed - Affidavit
Thursday, March 13, 2025
Complaint unsealed as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
3 3 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1), Initial Appearance is set for 3/13/2025 at 11:00 AM in Lake Charles, Courtroom 3 before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc. (crt,Jones, P) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORAL MOTION to Unseal Case by USA as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/13/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
5 5 DEFENDANT'S REQUEST / MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Motion Ripe Deadline set for 3/13/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
6 6 CJA 23 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed under seal by Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
7 7 ORDER granting5 Motion to Appoint Counsel as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). John Mario Piccione of the Office of the Federal Public Defender or itsdesignee is appointed to represent defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/13/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING INTERPRETER as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Interpreter Mervyn De La Torre appointed to interpret the language of Spanish in case as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/13/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
9 9 MINUTES for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1) held on 3/13/2025. ORAL ORDER granting 4 Motion to Unseal Case as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Interpreter appointed. Counsel appointed. Defendant waived his right to a Preliminary Hearing and waived his right to a Detention Hearing. Defendant ordered to remain in the custody of the U S Marshal pending filing of an Indictment or Bill of Information. (Court Reporter: LCR, Lake Charles-Crtrm 3) (Interpreter: Mervyn De La Torre) (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER REGARDING DUE PROCESS PROTECTIONS ACT in case as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/13/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P LeBlanc on 3/13/2025. (crt,YocumSld, M) [2:25-mj-00032-TPL]
Related: [-]
12 12 BILL OF INFORMATION as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1) Count 1. (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]
13 13 DEFENDANT INFORMATION SHEET filed under seal as to Ramon Montoya-Espinal (1). (crt,YocumSld, M)
Related: [-]