Original Case: 3:16-cv-00777

Federal Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvpri-01537
Typecivil private
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Mar 15, 2025 7:42 AM EDT
Counter-Defendant - Appellant
NOURI E. HAKIM
Represented By
Carol Welborn Reisman
Liskow & Lewis
contact info
Defendant
LINDSEY LAURAIN
Defendant/Counter-Claimant - Appellee
EAZY-PZ LLC
Represented By
Jennifer Kroell Fischer
Fischer Law Firm, PC
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
LUV N' CARE, LTD.
Represented By
Carol Welborn Reisman
Liskow & Lewis
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/15/2025 5:27 AM EDT
Thursday, March 13, 2025
1 1 Appeal docketed. Received: 03/07/2025. [1075070] Entry of Appearance due 03/27/2025. Certificate of Interest is due on 03/27/2025. Docketing Statement due 03/27/2025. Appellant's brief is due 05/12/2025. [GWK] [Entered: 03/13/2025 12:09 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 4 pgs Notice of Docketing
Att: 2 270 pgs Civil Case Docketed
2 2 3 pgs Entry of Appearance for Ben Williams as counsel for Appellee Eazy-PZ LLC. Service: 03/13/2025 by email. [1075136] 25-1537 [Ben Williams] [Entered: 03/13/2025 01:30 PM]
Related: [-]