Massachusetts District Court
Case #: 4:25-mj-04032
Case Filed:Feb 14, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Mar 16, 2025 3:18 AM EDT
Defendant
Barry Ward (1)
Represented By
Tom G. Vukmirovits
Tom G. Vukmirovits, Esq.
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Danial E. Bennett
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/16/2025 3:42 AM EDT
Friday, February 14, 2025
1 1 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Barry Ward; Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. (CS)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs COMPLAINT as to Barry Ward (1).(DMK) (DMK). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/18/2025) (DMK). (Attachment COMPLAINT as to Barry Ward (1). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit redacted, #2 JS45)(DMK) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2025: #3 Affidavit of Lauren Vatier (unredacted)) (DMK). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/18/2025) (DMK). (Attachment 1 replaced on 2/19/2025) (DMK). 1 replaced on 2/19/2025) (DMK).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 11 pgs Affidavit redacted,
Att: 2 2 pgs JS45
Att: 3 (2/14/2025) Affidavit of Lauren Vatier (unredacted)
5 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Barry Ward Initial Appearance set for 2/14/2025 04:30 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester (In person only) before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. (DMK)
Related: [-]
6 6 Electronic Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: Initial Appearance as to Barry Ward held on 2/14/2025 Case called. Defendant appears with counsel (CJA: Vukmirovits, T.) upon arrest today. Court informs Defendant of reason for his appearance, charges, rights and constitutional rights. Government states maximum penalties. Defendant submits financial affidavit. Court appoints CJA Vukmirovits to represent Defendant. Government moves for detention and states reasons therefore. Defendant advised of his right to Preliminary and Detention Hearings. Defendant waives the Preliminary Hearing, court finds a knowing and voluntary waiver of same. IN PERSON Detention Hearing set for 2/20/2025 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 1 - Worcester (In person only) before Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy. Court gives oral Brady order, written to issue as well. Defendant returned to the custody of the United States Marshal. (Attorneys present: Bennett, Vukmirovits, PO Crawford. )Court Reporter Name and Contact or digital recording information: Digital Recording. To order a copy of this Digital Recording, please email the Court at [LINK:https://forms.mad.uscourts.gov/Audio.html] . For a transcript of this proceeding, contact the Court by email at mad_transcripts@mad.uscourts.gov. (DMK)
Related: [-]
8 8 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Barry Ward. (DMK)
Related: [-]
9 9 Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy: ORDER entered. ORDER PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULE OF CRIMINAL PROCEDURE 5(f) entered as to Barry Ward. (DMK)
Related: [-]