Minnesota District Court
Judge:Joan N Ericksen
Referred: David T Schultz
Case #: 0:25-cv-00971
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1332-pip-Diversity-Personal Injury, Product Liability
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 3:31 AM CDT
Defendant
3M Company
Represented By
Benjamin W. Hulse
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Defendant
Arizant Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By
Benjamin W. Hulse
Norton Rose Fulbright Us LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Terri Funk
Represented By
Kyle W. Farrar
Kaster, Lynch, Farrar & Ball, LLP
contact info
Genevieve M Zimmerman
Meshbesher & Spence
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 notice Notice to Counsel to Comply with Pretrial Orders in Main MDL Case Mon 03/17 8:50 AM
(Text-Only) COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file IN RE: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-02666-JNE-DTS . (MKB)
Related: [-]
4 4 order MDL Pretrial Order Mon 03/17 8:49 AM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 1: Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016.(MKB)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 03/17 8:47 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Arizant Healthcare, Inc. (MKB)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Mon 03/17 8:44 AM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per Civil (MDL Direct Assign) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 25-cv-971 (JNE/DTS). Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MKB)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 15, 2025
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Sat 03/15 12:49 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 405, receipt number AMNDC-11746732) filed by Terri Funk. Filer requests summons issued. (Farrar, Kyle)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet