New Mexico District Court
Judge:John F Robbenhaar
Referred: Kirtan Khalsa
Case #: 1:25-cv-00274
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Case Filed:Mar 15, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 2:44 AM MDT
Defendant
John Doe 1
Defendant
Simon Hughes
Defendant
Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.
122 Girard Ave NE
Albuquerque, NM 87106
Defendant
Trent Toulouse
8715 Opportunity Dr NE
Albuquerque, NM 87109
Defendant
Larry Will
Plaintiff
Russell Warne
Represented By
Aaron Cress
Late Night Law
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
John Doe 2
Terminated: 03/31/2025


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
6 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Russell Warne (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
5 5 APPENDIX/SUPPLEMENT re4 Summons Returned Executed by Russell Warne (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
4 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Russell Warne. Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc. served on 4/2/2025, answer due 4/23/2025. (Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Summons Issued as to John Doe 1, Simon Hughes, Trent Toulouse, Larry Will. (jg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
3 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified First Amended Complaint for Damages against All Defendants. terminating John Doe 2., filed by Russell Warne.(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Summons Issued as to Rationalwiki Foundation, Inc.. (dr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar and United States Magistrate Judge Kirtan Khalsa assigned. (bc)
Related: [-]
PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge John F. Robbenhaar to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (bc)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 15, 2025
1 1 22 pgs COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Russell Warne.(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Affidavit
Filing and Administrative Fees Received: $ 405 receipt number ANMDC-9835513 re1 Complaint filed by Russell Warne (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Cress, Aaron)
Related: [-]