1
|
|
1
COMPLAINT as to Eric Kyu (1). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
2
|
|
2
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Initial Appearance as to Eric Kyu held on 8/8/2024. Bond Hearing as to Eric Kyu held on 8/8/2024. AUSA David Markewitz for the Government. Eric Lipton for the Defendant. BAIL DISPOSITION: DEF. RELEASED ON OWN RECOGNIZANCE $150,000 BOND; 1 FRP SECURED BY $150,000 CASH/PROPERTY: 34 Observatory Drive, roton on Hudson, NY 10520; TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS (& NO NEW APPLICATIONS); PRETRIAL SUPERVISION: AS DIRECTED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES; DEF. NOT TO POSSESS FIREARM/DESTRUCTIVE DEVICE/OTHER WEAPON. Defendant present and is advised of his rights and the charges against him. Public reading of the Complaint waived. PTS; Shannon Finneran present. Arguments heard concerning the scope and extent of Defendant's conditions of release. Defendant released on conditions. See bond. PRELIMINARY HEARING DATE: 9/4/2024 ON DEFENDANTS CONSENT. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
3
|
|
3
SECURED Bond Entered as to Eric Kyu in amount of $ 150,000.00, the agreement or tile defendant and each surety to forfeit the following cash or other property 34 Observatory Drive, Croton on Hudson, NY 10520. The defendant must: submit to supervision and report for supervision to the PRETRIAL SERVICES As Directed; surrender any passport to: PRETRIAL SERVICES not obtain a passport or other international travel document. abide by the following restrictions on personal association. residence, or travel: SDNY/EDNY; avoid all contact directly or indirectly any person who is or may be a victim or witness in the investigation or prosecution, including: No Contact with Any Co-Defendants, Co-Conspirators, Victims, or Witnesses Unless in The Presence of Counsel; not possess a firearm, destructive device or other weapon; report as soon as possible, to the pretrial services or supervising officer, every contact with law enforcement personnel, including arrests, questioning, or traffic stops. SEE BELOW 1. Refrain from possessing or using any internet accessible devices unless preapproved by PTS and submit to examination of this device. 2. The defendant's internet use is restricted to computer device(s) approved and monitored by Pretrial Services. The defendant must allow Pretrial Services to configure, manage, search, and/or install monitoring software on any computer device(s) approved for their use. 3. Refrain from access to or possessing pornographic material. 4. Refrain from any form of unsupervised contact with minors, including telephonic or online communication including his biological child. If the Defendant is permitted by Child Protective Services to return to live with his child, then this condition will no longer apply to Defendant's biological child. 5. Refrain from loitering near schoolyards, playgrounds, or other places frequented by minors. 6. Refrain from using any electronic equipment including but not limited to cell phones and video or still cameras, to record, store, or view images or photos of minors. 7. A void all contact with alleged victims and potential witnesses in this investigation. 8. Defendant may not reside in a home with his biological child unless approved by Child Protective Services. (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
4
|
|
4
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: James Kousouros appearing for Eric Kyu. Appearance Type: Retained. (Kousouros, James) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
5
|
|
5
CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from James Kousouros, Esq., dated August 14, 2024 re: Extension of Time to Satisfy the Conditions of the Appearance Bond . Document filed by Eric Kyu. (Kousouros, James) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
6
|
|
6
ORDER as to Eric Kyu (1) granting5 CONSENT LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from James Kousouros, Esq., dated August 14, 2024 re: Extension of Time to Satisfy the Conditions of the Appearance Bond. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 8/14/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
7
|
|
7
LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from James Kousouros, Esq., dated August 28, 2024 re: Modification to Conditions of Release . Document filed by Eric Kyu. (Kousouros, James) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
8
|
|
8
MEMO ENDORSEMENT as to Eric Kyu (1) granting7 LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause from James Kousouros, Esq., dated August 28, 2024 re: Modification to Conditions of Release. ENDORSEMENT: APPLICATION GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Victoria Reznik on 8/29/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
9
|
|
9
ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 9/4/2024 until 10/2/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 9/4/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
10
|
|
10
AFFIRMATION of Davis Markewitz in Support by USA as to Eric Kyu re:9 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
11
|
|
11
2ND ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 10/2/24 until 10/30/24. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 10/2/2024)(jw) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
12
|
|
12
AFFIRMATION of David Markewitz by USA as to Eric Kyu re:11 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (jw) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
13
|
|
13
3RD ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 10/30/2024 until 11/27/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 10/30/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
14
|
|
14
AFFIRMATION of David Markewitz in Support by USA as to Eric Kyu re:13 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
15
|
|
15
4TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 11/27/2024 until 12/25/2024. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 11/27/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
16
|
|
16
AFFIRMATION of David Markewitz in Support by USA as to Eric Kyu re:15 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
17
|
|
17
5TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 2/26/2024 until 1/22/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 12/26/2024) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
18
|
|
18
AFFIRMATION of David Markewitz in Support by USA as to Eric Kyu re:17 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
19
|
|
19
6TH ORDER TO CONTINUE IN THE INTEREST OF JUSTICE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 1/22/2025 until 2/19/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 1/22/2025) (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
20
|
|
20
AFFIRMATION of David Markewitz in Support by USA as to Eric Kyu re:19 Order to Continue - Interest of Justice. (ap) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
21
|
|
21
STIPULATION IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATION FOR 7TH OR SUBSEQUENT ORDER OF CONTINUANCE as to Eric Kyu. Time excluded from 2/19/2025 until 3/19/2025. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy on 2/19/2025) (lnl) [7:24-mj-02893-UA]
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case as to Eric Kyu REASSIGNED to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Judge Unassigned no longer assigned to the case. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
22
|
|
22
NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Eric Kyu. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Case Designated ECF as to Eric Kyu. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Arraignment as to Eric Kyu (1) Count 1 held on 3/14/2025. All parties present. Defendant: Eric Kyu. Defense Counsel: James Kousouros. AUSA: David Markewitz. The defendant waives indictment, and is arraigned on the one count Felony Information and waives public reading and enters a plea of not guilty. 5F obligations reviewed with the government. The case was previously assigned to Judge Karas. Bail conditions remain in effect. (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Plea entered by Eric Kyu (1) Count 1 Not Guilty. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Change of Plea Hearing as to Eric Kyu held on 3/14/2025. All parties present Defendant: Eric Kyu. Defense Counsel: James Kousouros. AUSA: David Markewitz. After executing the consent form to enter a Felony Plea Allocution before a USMJ. The defendant withdraws his previous plea of not guilty and enters a plea of guilty as charged in the one count Information. The Court directs a Pre Sentence Investigation, and schedules sentencing on 7/14/2025 at 11:00 am before Judge Karas. Report and Recommendation will be provided to the U.S.D.J via transcript. (See Transcript). (Sentencing set for 7/14/2025 at 11:00 AM before Judge Kenneth M. Karas) (Court Reporter Courtflow) (ap)
Related: [-]
|
|
|
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause: Plea entered by Eric Kyu (1) Guilty as to Count 1. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
23
|
|
23
INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Eric Kyu (1) count(s) 1. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
24
|
|
24
WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Eric Kyu. (ap)
Related: [-]
|
25
|
|
25
RULE 5(f) ORDER as to Eric Kyu. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew E. Krause on 3/14/2025) (ap)
Related: [-]
|
26
|
|
26
CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE ON A FELONY PLEA ALLOCUTION by Eric Kyu. (ap)
Related: [-]
|