Illinois Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Peter W Henderson
Case #: 1:25-bk-80201
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $1,000,001 to $10 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC
1325 Grand Ave
Macomb, IL 61455-3459
Represented By
Sumner A. Bourne
Rafool & Bourne P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office Of Nancy J. Gargula U.S. Trustee 401 Main St #1100
Peoria, IL 61602
Represented By
James Anthony Salinas
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
45 45 trustee Meeting of Creditors Held Fri 05/16 3:56 PM
Meeting of Creditors Held as Scheduled Related [+]. (Salinas, James)
Related: [-] 40 Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2025 at 02:00 PM via Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-888-394-3264, Participant Code: 5992494). filed by U.S. Trustee U.S. Trustee
Monday, May 12, 2025
44 44 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 05/12 10:53 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period April 2025 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Small Business Monthly Operating Report Mon 05/12 10:52 AM
Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period March 2025 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
42 42 court Hearing Held (Other) Tue 04/29 12:09 PM
Hearing Held Related [+] (court, shan)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC
Friday, April 25, 2025
41 41 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 04/25 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/25/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 39 Order on Application to Employ Professional
40 40 trustee Meeting of Creditors Adjourned (Continued) Fri 04/25 3:34 PM
Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors. 341(a) meeting to be held on 5/16/2025 at 02:00 PM via Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-888-394-3264, Participant Code: 5992494). (Salinas, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
39 39 order Employ Wed 04/23 5:10 PM
Order Granting Application to Employ Related [+] (court, lspi)
Related: [-] 15
Monday, April 21, 2025
38 38 1 pgs crtntc Order Request Notice Mon 04/21 9:20 AM
Court Notice Requesting Order Related [+] Order Due 5/5/2025. (court, shan)
Related: [-] 15 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC
Saturday, April 19, 2025
37 37 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/19 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 04/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 36 Post Petition Creditor Notice
Thursday, April 17, 2025
36 36 crtntc Post Petition Creditor Notice Thu 04/17 8:49 AM
Notice to Post Petition Creditors. (court, lspi)
Related: [-]
35 35 misc Pre-Status Conference Report (Ch 11 Subchapter V) Thu 04/17 7:55 AM
Pre-Status Conference Report Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
34 34 crtntc Generic Deficiency Notice Wed 04/16 1:18 PM
Deficiency Notice Re: Pre-Status Conference Report. Related [+] Deficiency Due 4/23/2025. (court, shan)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Hearing
33 33 order 7 Day Notice Order Wed 04/16 11:53 AM
7 Day Notice Order Related [+]. Required Document to be filed by 4/23/2025. (court, shan)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Hearing
utility Corrective Entry Wed 04/16 1:14 PM
Corrective Entry - Document number 33 entered in this case with no order attached or signed. Related [+] (court, shan)
Related: [-] 33 7 Day Notice Order
Monday, April 14, 2025
32 32 misc Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee) Mon 04/14 3:28 PM
Amendment to List of Creditors (Fee) Fee Amount $34 Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
31 31 misc Statement of Operations Mon 04/14 3:26 PM
Statement of Operations for Small Business Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Small Business Cash Flow Statement Mon 04/14 3:25 PM
Small Business Cash Flow Statement Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Small Business Federal Income Tax Return Mon 04/14 3:24 PM
Small Business Federal Income Tax Return Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Balance Sheet Mon 04/14 3:23 PM
Balance Sheet Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Correspondence Mon 04/14 3:22 PM
Correspondence Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Schedule of Income and Expenditures (non-individuals) Mon 04/14 3:21 PM
Schedule of Income and Expenditures (non-individuals) Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury Mon 04/14 3:19 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Schedules A/B-J Mon 04/14 3:18 PM
Schedule A/B Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Summary of Assets and Liabilities Mon 04/14 3:16 PM
Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Mon 04/14 3:15 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
21 21 misc Statement of Financial Affairs Mon 04/14 3:14 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 04/14 3:28 PM
Receipt of Amended Creditor Matrix (Fee)([LINK 25-80201 ) [misc,amdcm] ( 34.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14295125. Fee amount 34.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#32
Thursday, April 03, 2025
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 04/03 11:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/03/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time
Wednesday, April 02, 2025
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 04/02 11:34 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 04/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 Employment of Professional Objection Date Notice
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
18 18 order Extend/Shorten Time Tue 04/01 10:45 AM
Order Granting Motion to Extend/Shorten Time Related [+] (court, shan)
Related: [-] 17
Monday, March 31, 2025
17 17 motion Extend/Shorten Time Mon 03/31 5:17 PM
Motion to Extend/Shorten Time to to File Required Documents/Schedules, Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
16 16 crtntc Employment of Professional Objection Date Notice Mon 03/31 3:07 PM
Notice Scheduling Objections re Employment of Professional Related [+] Objections Due: 4/17/2025. (court, lspi)
Related: [-] 15 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC
15 15 5 pgs motion Employ Mon 03/31 2:10 PM
Application to Employ Rafool & Bourne, P.C. as Attorneys for Debtor In Possession Filed by Sumner A. Bourne of Rafool & Bourne P.C. on behalf of Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Employment Affidavit
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/21 11:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 11. Notice Date 03/21/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Hearing
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Thu 03/20 11:32 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. Related [+] No. of Notices: 12. Notice Date 03/20/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12
12 12 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Thu 03/20 3:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Kip Shelby of Law Offices of Kip Shelby, LLC on behalf of Denise S. Swanson, Kyle E. Swanson. (Shelby, Kip)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice (Attorney Filer - Text Only) Thu 03/20 10:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Ryan Baxter of McMillan, Hennenfent & DeJoode, P.C. on behalf of MidAmerica National Bank. (Baxter, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/19 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Requiring Missing Documents
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Wed 03/19 11:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/19/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order and Deficiency Notice for Chapter 11/12 Cases
8 8 order Setting Hearing Wed 03/19 10:21 AM
Order Setting Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference Hearing; Parties participating in this hearing are directed to call 1-855-244-8681 five minutes prior to the hearing time. Use Access Code or Meeting Number 2303 026 9252. Multiple hearings may be set at the same time. Please remain on the line until your hearing(s) are concluded and you are dismissed from the call. Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 4/29/2025 at 10:00 AM (p) Telephonic Conference, Peoria,IL for1 , Pre-Status Report Due By 4/15/2025. (court, lspi)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 & 12 Tue 03/18 5:11 PM
Meeting of Creditors 341(a) meeting to be held on 4/25/2025 at 02:00 PM via Telephonically with Chapter 11 Trustee (Conference Line: 1-888-394-3264, Participant Code: 5992494). Proofs of Claims due by 5/27/2025. Deadline to File a Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts: 6/24/2025. (court, lspi)
Related: [-]
6 6 1 pgs misc Correspondence Tue 03/18 4:33 PM
Correspondence Filed by James Anthony Salinas of DOJ-Ust on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Salinas, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 1 pgs trustee Verified Statement and Acceptance by Subchapter V Trustee Mon 03/17 2:36 PM
Ch 11 Subchapter V Trustee's Verified Statement and Acceptance of Appointment. (Eggmann, Robert)
Related: [-]
4 4 trustee Notice Appointing Trustee Mon 03/17 2:29 PM
Notice of Appointment of Trustee Robert E Eggmann. Robert E Eggmann added to the case. (Skaggs, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Chapter 11/12 Deficiency Notice-Order Mon 03/17 9:41 AM
Order and Deficiency Notice for Chapter 11/12 Cases Related [+]. Deficiency Due 3/31/2025. (court, lspi)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC
2 2 order Requiring Missing Documents Mon 03/17 9:39 AM
Order Requiring Missing Documents . Missing Documents Due by 3/31/2025. (court, lspi)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Credit Card (SYSTEM USE ONLY) Mon 03/17 8:07 AM
Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $1738 Filed by Valhalla Land Holdings, LLC Chapter 11 Plan Subchapter V Due by 06/16/2025. (Bourne, Sumner)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Mon 03/17 8:08 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 25-80201 ) [misc,volp11cc] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A14257109. Fee amount 1738.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1