Washington Western District Court
Judge:Kymberly K Evanson
Case #: 2:25-cv-00472
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:36 AM PDT
Defendant
RugsUSA LLC
Represented By
Emily Lynne Vo
Stoel Rives Llp (wa)
contact info
Timothy W. Snider
Stoel Rives Llp (or)
contact info
Plaintiff
Grant Zastrow
Represented By
Jonas Bram Jacobson
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Simon Franzini
Dovel & Luner LLP
contact info
Wright A Noel
Carson & Noel PLLC
contact info
Julian C Diamond
Bursor & Fisher Pa (ny)
contact info


Docket last updated: 35 minutes ago
Monday, April 14, 2025
17 17 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 04/14 10:23 AM
ORDER granting Defendant's15 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant RugsUSA, LLC is authorized to respond to Plaintiff Grant Zastrow's Complaint on or before 5/16/2025. Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (KRA)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Joint Status Report Order Form for District Judges Mon 04/14 7:14 AM
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 5/5/2025, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 5/19/2025, Joint Status Report due by 5/27/2025. (DS)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 04/14 11:23 AM
Attorney Timothy W. Snider added for Defendant RugsUSA LLC; per13 Notice of Appearance. (KRA)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 04/11 5:17 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint , filed by Defendant RugsUSA LLC. Noting Date 4/11/2025, (Vo, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 discov Corporate/Diversity Disclosure Statement Fri 04/11 5:14 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate RugsUSA Holdings, Inc. for RugsUSA LLC. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by RugsUSA LLC. (Vo, Emily)
Related: [-]
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Emily Lynne Vo on behalf of Defendant RugsUSA LLC. (Vo, Emily)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
12 12 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 4:01 PM
ORDER re11 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Simon Franzini for Plaintiff Grant Zastrow, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/07 12:23 PM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Simon Franzini FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Grant Zastrow (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8917878 (Noel, Wright)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
10 10 service Affidavit of Service of Summons & Complaint Tue 04/01 10:29 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons and Complaint on RugsUSA, LLC on 3/26/2025, filed by Plaintiff Grant Zastrow. (Noel, Wright)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
9 9 order Order on Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 10:33 AM
ORDER re8 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Julian C Diamond for Plaintiff Grant Zastrow, by Clerk Ravi Subramanian. No document associated with this docket entry, text only. NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d). (HH)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/26 10:04 AM
APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Julian Diamond FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Grant Zastrow (Fee Paid) Receipt No. AWAWDC-8900011 (Noel, Wright)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 03/24 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jonas Bram Jacobson on behalf of Plaintiff Grant Zastrow. (Jacobson, Jonas)
Related: [-]
6 6 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 03/24 10:49 AM
Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Pro Hac Vice Admission. See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc Attorneys Cho and Jacobson(CDA)
Related: [-]
5 5 utility Case/IFP Deficiency Letter Mon 03/24 10:46 AM
DISREGARD, clerical error in docketing. Will be re-docketed Notice of Filing Deficiency re 1 Complaint. ***Action Required*** See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc Attorneys Cho and Jacobson(CDA) Modified on 3/24/2025 to strike as no PDF was attached (CDA)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 order KKE Order Re Chambers Procedures CV (FORM) Fri 03/21 1:04 PM
ORDER REGARDING CHAMBERS PROCEDURES IN CIVIL CASES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
3 3 order KKE Standing Order re 28 USC 455 (FORM) Fri 03/21 1:02 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING 28 U.S.C. § 455(b)(2) AND CANON 3(C)(1)(B) OF THE CODE OF CONDUCT FOR UNITED STATES JUDGES Signed by District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson. (DS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 03/20 10:43 AM
Summons Electronically Issued as to defendants RugsUSA LLC (AVC)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 03/20 10:25 AM
District Judge Kymberly K. Evanson added. (AVC)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/17 10:46 AM
COMPLAINT against defendant(s) RUGSUSA, LLC with JURY DEMAND Related [+] filed by Grant Zastrow.(Noel, Wright)
Related: [-] ceipt # AWAWDC-8885240
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet