Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Case #: 1:25-mc-21246
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1782 Letter rogatory - appointment
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 03/18 2:15 PM
ORDER GRANTING WINCENT INVESTMENT FUND PCC LIMITED'SEX PARTE APPLICATION TO OBTAIN DISCOVERY FOR USEIN FOREIGN PROCEEDING PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. § 1782 Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/18/2025. See attached document for full details. (ar24)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/18 3:26 PM
Civil Case Terminated. Per chambers DE3 Closing Case. (mr1)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 order Judge Assignment Mon 03/17 5:00 PM
Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas (ar24)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs misccs Application for Judicial Assistance/Letter Rogatory Mon 03/17 2:27 PM
APPLICATION for Judicial Assistance Ex Parte Application for Discovery Pursuant 28 U.S.C. 1782 and Incorporated Memorandum of Law Ex Parte Application for Discovery Pursuant 28 U.S.C. 1782 and Incorporated Memorandum of Law . Filing fee $ 52.00 receipt number AFLSDC-18288424, filed by Wincent Investment Fund PCC Limited.(Slater, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Luke McMorrow with Exhibits,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order with Proposed Subpoena,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement