Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Charles Goodwin
Case #: 5:25-cv-00324
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Case in other court:Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-25-01131
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Kaci Miller
Represented By
Carrie B McNeer
Gable & Gotwals-Tulsa
contact info
Lance E Leffel
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Carrie B McNeer
Gable & Gotwals-Tulsa
contact info
Grant A Fitz
Grant Fitz
contact info
Ashlyn M Smith
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Lance E Leffel
Gable & Gotwals-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Matt Robbins
Represented By
Hannah Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Michael Burrage
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Reggie N Whitten
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Jake Denne
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Johnathon Scott Sanders
Whitten Burrage
contact info
Blake Sonne
Whitten Burrage
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
23 23 motion Discovery Thu 05/08 10:28 AM
MOTION for Discovery /Jurisdictional Discovery by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Smith, Ashlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Barlow,
Att: 2 Exhibit Cisneros,
Att: 3 Exhibit Porter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Oliver
22 22 motion Leave to File Reply Thu 05/08 10:03 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Reply /Sur-Reply by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Smith, Ashlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Sur-Reply
Friday, May 02, 2025
21 21 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/02 4:30 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Matt Robbins.(Denne, Jake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Oliver Remand Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Norman Remand Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit State Farm Agent Emails,
Att: 4 Exhibit Pruitt Remand Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
20 20 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 04/25 4:00 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ashlyn M Smith on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Smith, Ashlyn)
Related: [-]
19 19 respm Response to Motion Fri 04/25 3:23 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Smith, Ashlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Barlow Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Cisneros Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Porter Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Barlow Petition,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Cisneros Petition,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Porter Petition,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-Thomas,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-Roberson,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-State Farm Stearns Chart of Pleadings,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10-Wedin Petition,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11-Austin Petition,
Att: 12 Exhibit 12-Hosier,
Att: 13 Exhibit 13-Black's Application,
Att: 14 Exhibit 14-Hall's Application
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
18 18 notice ~Notice (other) Tue 04/08 2:56 PM
NOTICE (other) by Matt Robbins re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Notice of Supplemental Authority(Denne, Jake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Pruitt Remand Order
Monday, April 07, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/07 3:37 PM
ORDER granting16 Motion to Stay. The pending Motions to Dismiss (Doc. Nos.3 ,5 ) and briefing thereon are STAYED pending further order of the Court. Signed by Judge Charles Goodwin on 04/07/2025. (jb)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Fri 04/04 2:48 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to5 MOTION to Dismiss ,3 MOTION to Dismiss /Partial and to Stay Deadlines on Motions to Dismiss Until the Court Rules on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by All Plaintiffs. (Denne, Jake)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Fri 04/04 12:13 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Matt Robbins.(Sonne, Blake)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Remand Order in Oliver v. State Farm,
Att: 2 Exhibit Remand Order in Norman v. State Farm,
Att: 3 Exhibit Letters to Opposing Counsel
Monday, March 24, 2025
14 14 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Mon 03/24 1:59 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Kaci Miller . (McNeer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
13 13 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Fri 03/21 3:09 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (McNeer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 03/21 2:58 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Carrie B McNeer on behalf of Kaci Miller, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (McNeer, Carrie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 4:13 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jake Denne on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Denne, Jake)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 4:11 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Johnathon Scott Sanders on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sanders, Johnathon)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 4:09 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Hannah Whitten on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitten, Hannah)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 4:08 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Blake Sonne on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Sonne, Blake)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 4:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 4:04 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Reggie N Whitten on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Whitten, Reggie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
5 5 motion Dismiss Mon 03/17 2:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Kaci Miller.(Leffel, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Declarations,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Policy,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-Thomas Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Steinkamp Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-Goebel Order,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-Marino Order
4 4 16 pgs answer Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Mon 03/17 2:55 PM
ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Leffel, Lance)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Dismiss Mon 03/17 2:54 PM
MOTION to Dismiss /Partial by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(Leffel, Lance)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Policy,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Root Order
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Mon 03/17 2:52 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Lance E Leffel on behalf of Kaci Miller, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Leffel, Lance)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 03/17 1:25 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2025-1131 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(llr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet,
Att: 2 33 pgs Exhibit 2 - Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Entry of Appearance-pl,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Return of Service - Miller,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Return of Service - SFFCC,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Inspection Report,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Chart of Cases,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Declarations,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Policy,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10 - Email,
Att: 11 Civil Cover Sheet
misc Payment for a Civil Case Mon 03/17 3:27 PM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE /Notice of Removal Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4651406. (Leffel, Lance)
Related: [-]