District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Carl J Nichols
Case #: 1:25-cv-00779
Nature of Suit895 Other Statutes - Freedom of Information Act
Cause05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:44 AM EDT
Defendant
CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Defendant
OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Represented By
Stephanie R. Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES MADISON PROJECT
Represented By
Mark Steven Zaid
Law Offices Of Mark S. Zaid, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
BRIAN J. KAREM
22 West Jefferson Street Suite 309
Rockville, MD 20855
Represented By
Mark Steven Zaid
Law Offices Of Mark S. Zaid, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 90 minutes ago
Sunday, May 11, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Sun 05/11 4:57 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that Defendants'5 Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. Defendants shall file their response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before 5/30/2025. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 5/9/2025 (lccjn3)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 08, 2025
5 5 motion Extension of Time to Thu 05/08 9:38 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Sunday, April 20, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Sun 04/20 7:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is ORDERED that the Government's4 Consent Motion for Extension of Time is GRANTED. The Government shall respond to Plaintiffs'1 Complaint on or before 5/12/2025. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 4/20/2025 (lccjn3)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
4 4 motion Extension of Time to Fri 04/18 1:45 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE. (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 04/18 1:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie R. Johnson on behalf of CENTRAL INTELLIGENCE AGENCY, DEPARTMENT OF DEFENSE, OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Johnson, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Fri 03/21 1:02 PM
SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/18 12:21 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 03/17 3:55 PM
COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ADCDC-11547563) filed by JAMES MADISON PROJECT, BRIAN J. KAREM.(Zaid, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Summons - CIA,
Att: 3 Summons Summons - ODNI,
Att: 4 Summons Summons - DoD,
Att: 5 Summons Summons - AG,
Att: 6 Summons Summons - USAO DC