California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Maria A Audero
Case #: 2:25-cv-02329
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 1:57 AM PDT
Defendant
Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By
Elizabeth Courtney Farrell
Severson And Werson Apc
contact info
Plaintiff
Roberto Alvarez Jr.
Represented By
Mikayla Regier
Loker Law, Apc
contact info
Matthew Michael Loker
Loker Law, Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, April 21, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 04/21 3:56 PM
ORDER RE: STIPULATION TO ARBITRATE DISPUTE14 by Judge R. Gary Klausner: 1. The Joint Stipulation re: Arbitration filed by Plaintiff ROBERTO ALVAREZ JR and Defendant WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. is GRANTED; 2. The Parties shall submit the claims asserted in this Action to binding non-judicial arbitration; 3. The arbitration shall be conducted through the American Arbitration Association; and 4. The parties shall jointly file a status report every 90 days from the date of this order and within 7 days from the completion of arbitration. (lc) Modified on 4/21/2025 (lc)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 18, 2025
14 14 2 pgs stip Order Fri 04/18 5:32 PM
STIPULATION for Order to Arbitrate Dispute filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(Farrell, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
13 13 service Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days) Tue 04/08 1:54 PM
PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Roberto Alvarez Jr., upon Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association served on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/9/2025. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Rebecca Vang, Authorized Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Tue 04/08 1:31 PM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER (IN CHAMBERS) by Judge R. Gary Klausner: The Court has reviewed the Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer the Complaint10 filed on 4/8/2025. No later than 10:00 A.M. on 4/9/2025, Counsel for plaintiff(s) shall immediately file the proofs of service of the summons and complaint (including notices of acknowledgment and/or waivers of service) which forms the basis of the stipulated extension. Proof of service must generally be filed within 5 days of service. See Standing Order9 filed on 3/18/2025. Failure to comply with this order may result in the striking of the Stipulation to Extend. SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jre)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Tue 04/08 1:10 PM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association, (Farrell, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
10 10 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Tue 04/08 1:08 PM
STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Wells Fargo Bank, National Association answer now due 5/9/2025, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association.(Attorney Elizabeth Courtney Farrell added to party Wells Fargo Bank, National Association(pty:dft))(Farrell, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
9 9 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Tue 03/18 4:08 PM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 03/18 1:00 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, National Association. (lh)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Tue 03/18 12:56 PM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 03/18 12:55 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 03/18 12:55 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
4 4 notice Summons Request Mon 03/17 1:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alvarez Jr.. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 03/17 1:57 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alvarez Jr., (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 03/17 1:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alvarez Jr.. (Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 03/17 1:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-39313999 - Fee: $405, filed by Plaintiff Roberto Alvarez Jr.. (Attorney Matthew Michael Loker added to party Roberto Alvarez Jr.(pty:pla))(Loker, Matthew)
Related: [-]