Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Sara Lioi
Case #: 5:25-cv-00520
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 5:56 AM EDT
Defendant
Christine Fatheree
175 S. Main St 8th Fl
Akron, OH 44308
Represented By
Aaron B. Campbell
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Summit County
contact info
Defendant
Kristina Petroski
175 S. Main St 8th Fl
Akron, OH 44308
Represented By
Aaron B. Campbell
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Summit County
contact info
Defendant
Summit County Animal Control Department
175 S. Main St 8th Floor
Akron, OH 44308
Represented By
Aaron B. Campbell
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Summit County
contact info
Defendant
Summit County, Ohio
175 S. Main St 8th Fl
Akron, OH 44308
Represented By
Aaron B. Campbell
Office Of The Prosecuting Attorney - Summit County
contact info
Plaintiff
Alley Cat Allies, Incorporated
Represented By
DanaMarie K. Pannella
Holland & Muirden - Sharon Center
contact info


Docket last updated: 68 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
8 8 resp Response Tue 04/29 4:01 PM
Response to5 Motion to remand to State Court filed by All Defendants. (Campbell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 04/29 3:59 PM
Supplemental Motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction filed by Christine Fatheree, Kristina Petroski, Summit County Animal Control Department, Summit County, Ohio. (Campbell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
6 6 2 pgs order Order Thu 04/17 4:22 PM
Order . By May 1, 2025, defendants are ordered to file a supplement, supported by apposite federal authority, demonstrating why they are entitled to relief. Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss as supplemented is due on or before May 23, 2025. Chief District Judge Sara Lioi on 4/17/2025. (V,A)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
5 5 motion Remand to State Court Wed 04/16 3:00 PM
Motion to remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Alley Cat Allies, Incorporated. (Pannella, DanaMarie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
4 4 notice Attorney Appearance (atty event) Thu 03/27 2:56 PM
Attorney Appearance by DanaMarie K. Pannella filed by on behalf of Alley Cat Allies, Incorporated. (Pannella, DanaMarie)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
3 3 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/24 12:05 PM
Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim filed by Christine Fatheree, Kristina Petroski, Summit County Animal Control Department, Summit County, Ohio. (Campbell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
oth_evt Notice Regarding Attorney Admission Status Tue 03/18 10:19 AM
Notice to Attorney DanaMarie K. Pannella. The Court finds no record of your being admitted to practice in the Northern District of Ohio. Pursuant to LR 83.5, an Application for Admission to Practice or a Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice in this case must be filed within 10 business days. The local rules and the attorney admission application are available on the court's web site at: www.ohnd.uscourts.gov. If you are not the attorney of record in this case, a Motion to Withdraw as Attorney pursuant to LR 83.9 must be filed within 10 business days. (W,Jo)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Mon 03/17 4:53 PM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 03/17 3:19 PM
Notice of Removal from Summit County Court of Common Pleas, case number CV-2024 12-5393 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 405, receipt number AOHNDC-13007160.. Filed by Summit County, Ohio. (Campbell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed in state court March 3, 2025,
Att: 2 Complaint Plaintiff's Original Complaint filed in state court December 11, 2024,
Att: 3 Pleading Other documents filed in state court action,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Mon 03/17 4:47 PM
Chief District Judge Sara Lioi assigned to case. (E,CK)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Mon 03/17 4:49 PM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Amanda M. Knapp. (E,CK)
Related: [-]