Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam A Lindsay
Case #: 3:25-cv-00642
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 4:42 AM CDT
Defendant
FirstKey Homes LLC
Represented By
William Thomas Gordon
King & Spalding
contact info
James Robert Sheppard, III
King & Spalding LLP
contact info
Alfonso Garcia Chan
King & Spalding
contact info
Sherlyn Abdullah
King & Spalding
contact info
Plaintiff
Taki Harper
Represented By
Patrick Joseph Raspino
Wills Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Rhonda Hunter Wills
Wills Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Kobby T Warren
Warren Healy PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Shawnte Leigh
Represented By
Rhonda Hunter Wills
Wills Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kelly Williams
Represented By
Rhonda Hunter Wills
Wills Law Firm PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 22, 2025
31 31 misc Status Report Thu 05/22 2:59 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Taki Harper, Shawnte Leigh, Kelly Williams. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, May 09, 2025
30 30 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/09 3:05 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting29 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gina Merrill. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/9/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
29 29 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/06 11:47 AM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15477584) filed by FirstKey Homes LLCAttorney Gina Merrill added to party FirstKey Homes LLC(pty:dft) (Merrill, Gina)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Friday, May 02, 2025
28 28 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney Fri 05/02 3:44 PM
ORDER: The court determines that the27 Motion should be, and is hereby, granted. Accordingly, the court allows Mr. Alfonso Garcia Chan of the law firm King & Spalding LLP to withdraw as counsel for Defendant, and he is relieved of any further obligation to or representation of Defendant in this case. Ms. Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin of the law firm King & Spalding LLP is hereby substituted as local counsel of record for Defendant. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 5/2/2025) (kcr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
27 27 motion Withdraw Substitute Attorney Thu 05/01 4:25 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw Alfonso Garcia Chan , Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, added attorney Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin,Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin for FirstKey Homes LLC. Motion() filed by FirstKey Homes LLCAttorney Sarah Virginia Warburg-Koechlin added to party FirstKey Homes LLC(pty:dft) (Warburg-Koechlin, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, April 25, 2025
26 26 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Fri 04/25 4:56 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting25 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Sherlyn Abdullah. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/25/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
25 25 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Thu 04/24 12:10 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15449032) filed by FirstKey Homes LLCAttorney Sherlyn Abdullah added to party FirstKey Homes LLC(pty:dft) (Abdullah, Sherlyn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
24 24 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 3:01 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting21 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William Gordon. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/23/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
23 23 order Order on Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 2:59 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER granting19 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of J. Robert Sheppard, III. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/23/2025) (chmb)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 04/23 1:00 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15445551) filed by FirstKey Homes LLCAttorney William Thomas Gordon added to party FirstKey Homes LLC(pty:dft) (Gordon, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
22 22 order Status Report Order Wed 04/23 2:58 PM
ORDER REQUIRING ATTORNEY CONFERENCE AND STATUS REPORT: Attorney conference shall take place no later than 5/07/2025. No later than 5/22/2025, by 5:00 p.m., the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report ("Report") which sets forth the discovery plan proposed by the parties and any objections a party has to initial disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/22/2025) (twd)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Tue 04/22 5:02 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by FirstKey Homes LLC. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Chan, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 04/22 1:24 PM
Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number ATXNDC-15442152) filed by FirstKey Homes LLCAttorney James Robert Sheppard, III added to party FirstKey Homes LLC(pty:dft) (Sheppard, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, April 21, 2025
18 18 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/21 5:01 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint,,,,, filed by FirstKey Homes LLC. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Chan, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 10, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 04/10 2:57 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to1 Complaint. Answer due 4/21/2025. (Ordered by Judge Sam A. Lindsay on 4/10/2025) (cfk)
Related: [-]
16 16 respm Reply Thu 04/10 9:59 AM
REPLY filed by FirstKey Homes LLC re:14 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Chan, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
15 15 respm Response/Objection Wed 04/09 5:02 PM
RESPONSE filed by Taki Harper, Shawnte Leigh, Kelly Williams re:14 MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 motion Extension of Time Wed 04/09 12:11 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint filed by FirstKey Homes LLCAttorney Alfonso Garcia Chan added to party FirstKey Homes LLC(pty:dft) (Chan, Alfonso)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
13 13 service Summons Returned Tue 03/25 12:50 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed as to All Defendants. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 03/18 2:44 PM
Summons Issued as to FirstKey Homes LLC. (cfk)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 12:13 PM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Darma Celis on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
10 10 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 11:35 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Samantha Fondren on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
9 9 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Breeona Fields on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
8 8 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Latavier Wilson on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
7 7 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 11:13 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Rhonda Ferris on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 11:12 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Taylor Franzi on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Tue 03/18 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Consent to Become a Party Plaintiff signed by Destiny Thomas on 3/18/2025. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Consent
4 4 misc Request for Clerk to Issue Document Tue 03/18 11:09 AM
Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Taki Harper, Shawnte Leigh, Kelly Williams. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
3 3 qcref Lindsay Tue 03/18 10:06 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge McKay). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement Mon 03/17 4:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Taki Harper, Shawnte Leigh, Kelly Williams. (Clerk QC note: No affiliate entered in ECF). (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/17 4:36 PM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against FirstKey Homes LLC filed by Taki Harper, Kelly Williams, Shawnte Leigh. (Filing fee $405; Receipt number ATXNDC-15345872) Summons(es) not requested at this time. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Wills, Rhonda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Notices of Consent