Czajka v. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA , Inc. et al
Georgia Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Leigh Martin May |
Case #: | 1:25-cv-01376 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Mar 14, 2025 |
Terminated: | Mar 14, 2025 |
Last checked: Monday Apr 28, 2025 5:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
CooperSurgical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA , Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Cooper Companies, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Teva Women's Health, LLC.
|
|
Plaintiff
Toni Czajka
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 26, 2025 | ||
3 | 3
![]() WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Toni Czajka. CooperSurgical, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/19/2025; Teva Branded Pharmaceutical Products R&D, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/19/2025; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. waiver mailed on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/19/2025; Teva Women's Health, LLC. waiver mailed on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/19/2025; The Cooper Companies, Inc waiver mailed on 3/19/2025, answer due 5/19/2025. (Feller, Christina) |
|
Wednesday, March 19, 2025 | ||
utility
Remark
Wed 03/19 10:44 AM
Remark: Counsel should review all Orders docketed in MDL Case No. 1:20-md-2974-LMM. The Court's Case Management Orders and other case-related documents can also be found on the Court's MDL web page: https://www.gand.uscourts.gov/20md2974 (bnp) |
||
Friday, March 14, 2025 | ||
2 | 2
![]() ORDER INITIAL CONFERENCE: The Court held its Initial Conference in this MDL on February 9, 2021. The below arethe orders entered after discussion of these issues at that conference. 1. Leadership structure: After the Courtdiscussed issues concerning the leadership structure with all parties, the Court ORDERED Plaintiffs and Defendantsto each file their proposed consent motion and order as to their requested leadership structure and team within 7days of the date of this order. 2. Future status conferences: The Court will hold status conferences once a month.The next six conferences will take place on the following dates at 10:00 am via zoom: Tuesday, March 9, 2021;Monday, April 12, 2021; Wednesday, May 12, 2021; Monday, June 14, 2021; Tuesday, July 13, 2021; Friday, August20, 2021. The Court will send out the zoom links prior to the conferences. The parties will submit a proposedconsent agenda 3 business days prior to the conference. The parties will also confer as to the format for presentingissues that require additional explanation. When these are necessary, they should also be filed 3 business daysbefore the conference. 3. Stay of responsive pleading obligations: The Court continues the stay of responsivepleading obligations provided for in Section 6(b) of the Court's initial order. 4. Pending motions: The Court DENIESWITHOUT PREJUDICE all pending motions in the individual cases comprising the MDL. These cases are alsoADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED. These terminated motions will later be refiled in accordance with an upcoming CaseManagement Order. 5. Docketing: All parties are to docket future filings only in the MDL case. The case captionshould indicate whether any filing applies to all cases or list the individual cases to which it should apply. 6.Electronic service: The Court ORDERS all attorneys participating in the MDL proceeding to register with the Court'sCM/ECF system. Because all attorneys will then receive electronic copies of documents filed in the MDL, the CourtORDERS that electronic service of documents via the Court's CM/ECF system satisfies the obligation of service.Hereafter, unless otherwise ordered, neither the clerk's office nor counsel for the parties shall be obligated toprovide service copies of any filings or related orders by U.S. Mail or any other means to attorneys who have notregistered with the Court's CM/ECF system. An attorney who is not participating in the MDL and does not want toreceive CM/ECF notifications may file a motion to withdraw or a certificate of consent to withdraw in accordancewith Local Rule 83.1(E). 7. Initial disclosures: The Court GRANTS the parties' joint request for the Court to excusethe parties from Rule 26(f) initial disclosures; except as to the ParaGard New Drug Application (NDA) that wastransferred on or about November 10, 2005, to Duramed Pharmaceuticals, Inc., and produced by TWH, Inc., toplaintiff in the Estrada case. 8. Case management and initial orders: The parties are ORDERED to confer as toproposed orders for the list found herein. See order for further specifics and instructions. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 2/10/2021. (djs) |
|
1 | 1
![]() SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number AGANDC-14144486) filed by Toni Czajka. Direct File MDL-USDC Northern District of Ohio.(djs) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Mon 03/17 2:32 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (djs) |