Louisiana Western District Court
Judge:Terry A Doughty
Referred: Joseph H L Perez-Montes
Case #: 1:25-cv-00333
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause05:7703 Discrimination - Review of Agency Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 3:49 AM CDT
Defendant
Crest Operations L L C
Plaintiff
Carol M Hendrix, LA
Represented By
James Eugene Mixon
Mixon Carroll & Frazier
contact info
James L Carroll
Mixon Carroll & Frazier
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, March 20, 2025
5 5 order Jurisdictional Review Finding Thu 03/20 11:02 AM
ELECTRONIC JURISDICTIONAL REVIEW FINDING: Having reviewed the pleadings, and any amended pleadings, the court finds that subject matter jurisdiction exists pursuant to: 28 U.S.C. section 1331. This finding is preliminary and may be reconsidered sua sponte or on appropriate motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph H.L. Perez-Montes on 3/20/2025. (crt,Tice, Y)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
4 4 service Summons Issued - All (Form Included) Wed 03/19 9:42 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Crest Operations L L C. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/18 4:53 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by Carol M Hendrix. (aty,Carroll, James)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 03/18 3:31 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency to James Eugene Mixon on behalf of Carol M Hendrix regarding1 Complaint,. Reason: No Civil Cover Sheet (form JS-44) accompanied this complaint or notice of removal. In accordance with Local Rule 10.1, a completed and executed Civil Cover Sheet form shall accompany the initial pleading of each civil case to be filed, except that such requirement shall not apply to persons in the custody of civil, state or federal institutions or to persons filing cases pro se. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 03/17 4:28 PM
COMPLAINT against Crest Operations, LLC with Jury Demand (Filing fee $405, receipt number ALAWDC-6217779) filed by Carol M Hendrix.(Attorney James Eugene Mixon added to party Carol M Hendrix(pty:pla))(aty,Mixon, James)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 03/18 3:27 PM
CASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Joseph H L Perez-Montes. (crt,Thomas, T)
Related: [-]