New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Case #: 1:25-cv-02203
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:40 AM EDT
Defendant
Splintek Inc.
Plaintiff
Frangie Espinal
New York, NY 10003
Represented By
Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb
Jeffrey M. Gottlieb, Esq.
contact info
Michael A. LaBollita
Gottlieb & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, March 20, 2025
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/20 5:09 PM
ORDER: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of service of the summons and complaint, the parties must meet and confer for at least one hour in a good-faith attempt to settle this action. To the extent the parties are unable to settle the case themselves, they must also discuss whether further settlement discussions through the district's court-annexed mediation program or before a magistrate judge would be productive at this time. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within fifteen (15) additional days (i.e., within forty-five (45) days of service of the summons and complaint), the parties must submit a joint letter requesting that the Court either (1) refer the case to mediation or a magistrate judge (and indicate a preference between the two options), or (2) schedule an initial status conference in the matter. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/20/2025) (ks)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 03/19 9:19 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Splintek Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Wed 03/19 9:17 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Wed 03/19 9:18 AM
Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Wed 03/19 9:18 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Wed 03/19 9:19 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael A. LaBollita. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/18 12:41 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Michael Gottlieb on behalf of Frangie Espinal..(Gottlieb, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Tue 03/18 12:15 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Splintek Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Frangie Espinal..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Tue 03/18 12:11 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 12:05 AM
COMPLAINT against Splintek Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-30780801)Document filed by Frangie Espinal..(LaBollita, Michael)
Related: [-]