Tennessee Middle District Court
Judge:Aleta A Trauger
Case #: 3:25-cv-00304
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 7:34 AM CDT
Defendant
Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.
Defendant
The Toro Company
Represented By
Thomas William A. Caldwell
Ortale Kelley Law Firm
contact info
Maggie M. Logan
contact info
David B. Scott
Ortale Kelley Law Firm
contact info
Chicoya Smith Gallman
Ortale Kelley Law Firm
contact info
Toby M. McKinstry
Tomlinson Rust Mckinstry Grable, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gerald Johnson
Represented By
Loyd G. Anglin
Anglin Law
contact info
Dewey Russell Thomas
The Thomas Law Firm
contact info
L. Gilbert Anglin
contact info
Plaintiff
Laurel Johnson
Represented By
Loyd G. Anglin
Anglin Law
contact info
Dewey Russell Thomas
The Thomas Law Firm
contact info
L. Gilbert Anglin
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/11/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Toby M. McKinstry on behalf of The Toro Company (McKinstry, Toby)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 05/06 3:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Maggie M. Logan on behalf of The Toro Company (Logan, Maggie)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 01, 2025
21 21 service Alias Summons Issued Thu 05/01 3:11 PM
ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. (ad)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 05/01 2:04 PM
ORDER granting15 and16 : Having satisfied the requirements of Local Rule 83.01(b), the Motions for Maggie M. Logan and Toby M. McKinstry to Appear Pro Hac Vice are granted. Signed by Lynda M. Hill, Clerk of Court, on 05/01/2025. (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
19 19 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Wed 04/30 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Alias Summons to be Issued as to Sunbelt Rentals, Inc. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Thomas, Dewey)
Related: [-]
18 18 service Summons Returned Unexecuted Wed 04/30 10:42 AM
Summons Returned Unexecuted by Gerald Johnson, Laurel Johnson as to Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. (Thomas, Dewey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/29 10:21 AM
OK State Bar status verified as active for Maggie M. Logan, Toby M. McKinstry not admitted to this court - Local counsel secured . (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 04/28 2:54 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by The Toro Company.(Caldwell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 1:56 PM
MOTION for attorney Toby M. McKinstry to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4310802) by The Toro Company.(Caldwell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 04/28 1:53 PM
MOTION for attorney Maggie M. Logan to Appear Pro Hac Vice (paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number ATNMDC-4310791) by The Toro Company.(Caldwell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 9:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Chicoya Smith Gallman on behalf of The Toro Company (Gallman, Chicoya)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 04/22 9:29 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas William A. Caldwell on behalf of The Toro Company (Caldwell, Thomas)
Related: [-]
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 04/22 11:12 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for David B. Scott, Thomas William A. Caldwell, Chicoya Smith Gallman admitted to this court . (ad)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/22 9:30 AM
ORDER: Motion11 for Extension of Time to Answer re1 Complaint GRANTED.Extension to 4/28/2025. Signed by District Judge Aleta A. Trauger on 04/21/2025. (ad)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/21 2:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by The Toro Company. (Scott, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 04/21 2:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by David B. Scott on behalf of The Toro Company (Scott, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 04/17 2:46 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Gerald Johnson, Laurel Johnson. The Toro Company served on 3/31/2025. (Thomas, Dewey)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 03/19 4:31 PM
Summons issued as to Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., The Toro Company. (ad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
7 7 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Tue 03/18 2:00 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to Sunbelt Rentals, Inc.. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Anglin, Loyd)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Summons to be Issued Tue 03/18 1:59 PM
NOTICE of Summons to be Issued as to The Toro Company. Counsel is responsible for printing and serving the summons after it is issued by the Clerk's Office. (Anglin, Loyd)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Case Management Conference Tue 03/18 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2025 at 04:00 PM in Chambers - Suite 6325 before District Judge Aleta A. Trauger. (sb)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice/Information re Consent of the Parties to MJ Tue 03/18 10:22 AM
NOTICE/INFORMATION regarding Consent of the Parties to the Magistrate Judge. (sb)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Business Entity Disclosure Statement Filing Requirement Tue 03/18 10:22 AM
NOTICE of Business Entity Disclosure Statement filing requirement. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Admin Order 217 Tue 03/18 10:21 AM
NOTICE OF ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER NO. 217 to parties re obligation of counsel to keep Court apprised of current contact information. (sb)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 10:18 AM
COMPLAINT against Sunbelt Rentals, Inc., The Toro Company (Filing fee $405, Receipt number ATNMDC-4281004), filed by Gerald Johnson, Laurel Johnson.(sb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet
Monday, March 17, 2025
misc Annotation - Bar Status Tue 03/18 10:26 AM
TN State Bar status verified as active for Dewey Russell Thomas, L. Gilbert Anglin, Loyd G. Anglin admitted to this court . (sb)
Related: [-]