California Eastern District Court
Judge:Jennifer L Thurston
Referred: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Case #: 1:25-cv-00324
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Mar 17, 2025
Last checked: Thursday May 01, 2025 2:41 AM PDT
Defendant
County of Madera
Plaintiff
Robin Burgess
Represented By
Angel Horacek
Law Offices Of Angel J. Horacek
contact info
Angel James Horacek
Law Offices Of Angel J. Horacek, PC
contact info
Iryll Robbins-Umel
Law Offices Of Angel J. Horacek, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
6 6 misc Stipulation and Proposed Order Fri 05/02 11:49 AM
STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER Extension of Tine to File Responsive Pleading to Complaint by County of Madera. Attorney Litman, David G. added. (Litman, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 04/21 8:57 AM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: County of Madera served on 4/14/2025, answer due 5/5/2025. (Horacek, Angel)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 03/21 1:44 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Madera by Robin Burgess.(Horacek, Angel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 misc Civil New Case Documents for JLT Tue 03/18 8:56 AM
CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/26/2025 at 10:00 AM in Yosemite (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Standing Order,
Att: 2 Consent Form,
Att: 3 VDRP
2 2 service Summons Tue 03/18 8:38 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Madera* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Angel Horacek* *5701 W. Slauson Ave* *Suite 210* *Culver City, CA 90230*. (Deputy Clerk CM)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 17, 2025
1 1 COMPLAINT against County of Madera by Robin Burgess. Attorney Horacek, Angel added. (Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACAEDC-12102276)(Horacek, Angel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet