Puerto Rico District Court
Case #: 3:25-cr-00129
Case Filed:Mar 13, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 19, 2025 3:17 AM AST
Defendant
Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1)
Represented By
Carmen Coral Rodriguez-Morales
Federal Public Defender'S Office
contact info
Federal Public Defender Office
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Probation Office
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lani E. Lear
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/19/2025 3:57 AM AST
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
Arrest of Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). (mcc) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). (idg) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
2 2 *RESTRICTED* Arrest Warrant Issued by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez in case as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). (idg) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
3 3 *RESTRICTED* CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). (mcc) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez: Initial Appearance as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1) held on 3/11/2025. AUSA Maria C. Semanaz and AFPD Ivan Santos were present. Defendant was under custody, present in court, and assisted by a certified court interpreter. Defendant was advised of his rights and the applicable minimum and maximum statutory penalties that he is exposed to if convicted of the charges in the criminal complaint. After reviewing the CJA-23 form filled by the defendant, the Court deemed it appropriate to appoint counsel. The FPD was appointed to represent the defendant. A Bail Hearing is set for 3/14/2025 at 01:30 PM in Hato Rey Courtroom 5 before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. A Preliminary Examination is set for 3/20/2025 at 10:00 AM in Hato Rey Courtroom 5 before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, Pub. L. No. 116-182, 134 Stat. 894 (Oct. 21, 2020) and Rule 5(f) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, the United States is reminded of its obligation to disclose in a timely manner all exculpatory evidence to the defendant[s], that is, all evidence that is favorable to the defendant[s] or tends to cast doubt on the United States case, as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963) and its progeny. Failure to comply with this order may result in consequences, including, but not limited to, the reversal of any conviction, the exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, disciplinary action, and/or sanctions by the Court. The Court ordered the defendant temporarily detained. (Court Reporter DCR.) (Hearing held in Hato Rey Courtroom 5.) Hearing set for 06:11. Hearing held at 06:11. Hearing ended at 06:18. Interpreter Leilanie Solis. (mcc) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 3/11/2025. (mcc) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER detention hearing as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). Defendant is TEMPORARILY DETAINED pending the bail hearing. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 3/11/2025. (mcc) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 12, 2025
7 7 ***SELECTED PARTIES***Notice of Disclosure of Pretrial Services Report as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). Pretrial Services Reports are made available to Defense Counsel and the Government. The Pretrial Reports are not public record, are not to be produced or disclosed to any other party, and shall remain confidential as provided in Title 18 U.S.C. 3153(c)(1), by USA, US Probation Office, Erizon Diaz-Rivas (Navedo-Sanchez, Eduardo) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carmen Coral Rodriguez-Morales appearing for Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1) (Rodriguez-Morales, Carmen) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Lani E. Lear appearing for USA. (Lear, Lani) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Maria C. Semanaz-Ojeda by USA as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). Responses due by 3/27/2025. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Semanaz-Ojeda, Maria) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER regarding10 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney: Granted. AUSA Maria Cristina Semanaz-Ojeda withdrawn from case as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1). Signed by US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez on 3/13/2025. (mcc) [3:25-mj-00212-MEL]
Related: [-]
12 12 INDICTMENT as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1) count(s) 1. (vdm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NPV Indictment
13 13 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez: Return of Indictment by Grand Jury as to Erizon Diaz-Rivas (1) held on 3/13/2025. Arraignment/Bail set for 3/14/2025 01:30 PM in Hato Rey Courtroom 5 before US Magistrate Judge Marcos E. Lopez. Defendant under custody: Marshals to produce defendant. (Court Reporter DCR.)(Hearing held in OSJ Courtroom 6.) (vdm)
Related: [-]