Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Timothy D Degiusti
Case #: 5:25-cv-00328
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1345 Replevin & Conversion
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
Okey Nwokolo
Represented By
Atefeh E Borghei
Borghei Law Offices PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Ronald R Gallegos
Us Attorney'S Office-Okc
contact info
Amanda R Johnson
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, April 18, 2025
7 7 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 04/18 4:28 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Atefeh E Borghei on behalf of Okey Nwokolo (Borghei, Atefeh)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Fri 04/18 4:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Okey Nwokolo.(Borghei, Atefeh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 04/08 1:08 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Okey Nwokolo served on 3/29/2025.(Gallegos, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Proof of Service Affidavit
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 1:06 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Ronald R Gallegos on behalf of United States of America (Gallegos, Ronald)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Tue 04/08 1:03 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Amanda R Johnson on behalf of United States of America (Johnson, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 03/18 2:00 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to Okey Nwokolo. (rp)
Related: [-]
1 1 5 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 1:59 PM
COMPLAINT against Okey Nwokolo filed by United States of America.(rp)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet