Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Timothy D Degiusti
Case #: 5:25-cv-00329
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Case in other court:Oklahoma County District Court, CJ-24-07447
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 4:18 AM CDT
Defendant
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By
Natalie M McMahan
Phillips Murrah P.C.
contact info
Kathryn D Terry
Phillips Murrah P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Fox
Represented By
Christopher L Fox
Heron Fox Trout & Sherry PC
contact info
James A Scimeca
Burch George & Germany
contact info
Plaintiff
Teresa Fox
Represented By
Christopher L Fox
Heron Fox Trout & Sherry PC
contact info
James A Scimeca
Burch George & Germany
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Wed 04/16 10:57 AM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(McMahan, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - OID Service Documents
Friday, March 28, 2025
6 6 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 03/28 1:24 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by James A Scimeca on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Scimeca, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint / Disclaimer Tue 03/25 8:30 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(McMahan, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - August 10, 2023 Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Related Claim Notes
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Fri 03/21 4:22 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company . (McMahan, Natalie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 03/21 4:21 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Natalie M McMahan on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (McMahan, Natalie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
2 2 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 03/19 10:43 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Kathryn D Terry on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Terry, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Wed 03/19 10:42 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AOKWDC-4653254. (Terry, Kathryn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/18 1:59 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Oklahoma County District Court, case number CJ-2024-7447 filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(llr)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Proof of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet