Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 8:23-bk-10571

California Central Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Scott C Clarkson
Case #: 8:25-ap-01174
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
The Debt Relief Group LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company
Represented By
The Debt Relief Group LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Richard A. Marshack, Trustee of the LPG Liquidation Trust
Represented By
Sarah S. Mattingly
Dinsmore & Shohl, LLP
contact info
Trustee
Richard A Marshack (TR)
Marshack Hays Wood LLP 870 Roosevelt
Irvine, CA 92620
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee (SA)
411 W Fourth St., Suite 7160
Santa Ana, CA 92701


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Saturday, May 17, 2025
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sat 05/17 9:17 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/17/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Notice that Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC)
Thursday, May 15, 2025
12 12 misc Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default (BNC) Thu 05/15 6:03 PM
Notice That Clerk Has Entered Default Against Defendant(s) The Debt Relief Group LLC, a Florida Limited Liability Company Related [+] (GD)
Related: [-] 9 Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
11 11 misc Status report Wed 05/14 9:28 PM
Status report Notice of Filing of Omnibus Status Report on Certain Adversary Cases Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack Related [+]. (Lissebeck, Yosina)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
10 10 misc Status report Wed 05/14 2:45 PM
Status report Filed by Trustee Richard A Marshack (TR) Related [+]. (Mattingly, Sarah)
Related: [-] 3 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
9 9 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 05/14 9:54 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to The Debt Relief Group LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Mattingly, Sarah)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Request for Entry of Default (Local BK Rule 7055-1) Wed 05/14 9:46 AM
Request for Entry of Default Under Local Bankruptcy Rule 7055-1, as to The Debt Relief Group LLC a Florida Limited Liability Company Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Mattingly, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 01, 2025
7 7 notice Notice Tue 04/01 12:26 PM
Notice of Required Compliance with Rule 7026 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure and Rule 7026-1 of the Local Bankruptcy Rules Filed by Plaintiff Richard A. Marshack. (Mattingly, Sarah)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 04/01 12:18 PM
Summons Service Executed on The Debt Relief Group LLC 4/1/2025 (Mattingly, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 27, 2025
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 03/27 9:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 03/27/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order (Generic) (BNC-PDF)
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
4 4 court Summons Issued Tue 03/25 3:22 PM
Summons Issued on The Debt Relief Group LLC Date Issued 3/25/2025, Answer Due 4/24/2025 Related [+] Status Conference hearing to be held on 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM at Crtrm 5C, 411 W Fourth St., Santa Ana, CA 92701. The case judge is Scott C Clarkson (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
3 3 order X - Order (Generic)(BNC-PDF) Tue 03/25 3:21 PM
Order RE: Early Meeting Of Counsel, Status Conference Instructions, And General Procedures. IT IS ORDERED: The Court Finds It Appropriate To Issue The Following Order In Lieu Of Its Early Meeting Of Counsel And Status Conference Instructions. The Specific Date For A Particular Status Conference Will Be Identified In The Applicable Summons, To Be Served With The Complaint. (All Status Conferences Will Be Conducted IN PERSON In Courtroom 5C, Located At 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, CA 92701. Any Out-Of-District Attorney Admitted Pro Hac Vice Must Also Have Local Counsel Present. No Virtual Or Telephonic Appearances Will Be Permitted.) (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER RULING.) (BNC-PDF) Related [+] Signed on 3/25/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-] 1
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
2 2 court Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required Tue 03/18 11:53 AM
Notice to Filer of Correction Made/No Action Required: Incorrect case data/statistical information was entered at the time of filing. Incorrect plaintiff/defendant/attorney/party information was entered at the time of filing. THE COURT HAS CORRECTED THIS INFORMATION. THIS ENTRY IS PROVIDED FOR FUTURE REFERENCE. Related [+] (NB8)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
1 1 26 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 10:45 AM
Adversary case 8:25-ap-01174. Complaint by Richard A. Marshack, Trustee of the LPG Liquidation Trust against The Debt Relief Group LLC. Fee Amount $350 Nature of Suit: (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)), Sarah)Modified on 3/18/2025 (NB8). - See docket entry no.: 3 for corrections Modified on 3/18/2025 (NB8)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit