Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:25-cv-80363
Nature of Suit465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions
Cause28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 7:15 AM EDT
Defendant
Kathy Baranowski
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Carlos Javier Raurell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kristi Noem
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Carlos Javier Raurell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Kika Scott
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Carlos Javier Raurell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)
Represented By
Noticing INS Attorney
contact info
Carlos Javier Raurell
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Plaintiff
Sevenet Ceus
5742 lantana Cir. East
Lake Worth, FL 33463


Docket last updated: 79 minutes ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/24 4:47 PM
PROCEDURE FOR OPTING-OUT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION FOR DEFENDANTS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 4/24/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
6 6 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Wed 04/23 11:54 AM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction1 Complaint, AS MOOT by United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS), Kika Scott, Kristi Noem, Kathy Baranowski. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS)(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Kika Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party Kathy Baranowski(pty:dft). Responses due by 5/7/2025. (Raurell, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
5 5 4 pgs order Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant Mon 03/31 10:38 AM
ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE PARTIES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/31/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 03/31 10:37 AM
PROCEDURE FOR OPTING-OUT OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 3/31/2025. See attached document for full details. (amb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
3 3 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Wed 03/19 9:19 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 3/18/2025 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number 9419 (amb)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Judge Assignment Tue 03/18 4:05 PM
Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart (amb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 4:03 PM
COMPLAINT against Kathy Baranowski, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services (USCIS). Filing fees $ 405.00, filed by Sevenet Ceus. Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (amb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet