Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Rodolfo A Ruiz, II
Case #: 1:25-cv-21270
Nature of Suit340 Torts - Personal Injury - Marine
Cause28:1333 Admiralty
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 7:16 AM EDT
Defendant
Dragos Sprinceana
Defendant
DMG Consulting & Development, Inc
Defendant
GCYC SIRENA 88 LLC
Defendant
M/Y Olympus
Miami Beach, FL 33139
Plaintiff
Centennial Bank
Represented By
Nicholas J Zeher
Robert Allen Law
contact info
Jessie Grace Pulitzer
Critton, Luttier & Coleman
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Monday, May 05, 2025
30 30 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 05/05 2:34 PM
ORDER REQUIRING MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT OR NOTICE OF JOINT LIABILITY re21 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default,18 Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Against as to M/Y Olympus filed by Centennial Bank Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 5/5/2025. See attached document for full details. (drz)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion to Seal Mon 05/05 10:46 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting28 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal. Plaintiff is instructed to re-file Exhibit B [ECF Nos. 1-6, 5-2] separately under seal. The clerk is also instructed to replace Exhibit B [ECF Nos. 1-6, 5-2] with the redacted version of Exhibit B [ECF Nos. 1-6, 5-2]. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz II on 5/5/2025. (gp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
28 28 3 pgs motion Motion to Seal (Public) Tue 04/29 6:40 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal EXHIBIT "B" TO [DE 1-6] AND [DE 5-2] per Local Rule 5.4 by Centennial Bank. (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to File Under Seal
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
27 27 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Thu 04/24 11:52 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re25 Summons Returned Executed,. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see de 26 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (pc)
Related: [-]
26 26 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted Thu 04/24 11:50 AM
Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted as to Dragos Sprinceana. (see DE25 for image). (pc)
Related: [-]
25 25 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/23 4:00 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint RE: Seaman,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Centennial Bank. Dragos Sprinceana served on 4/17/2025, response/answer due 5/8/2025. (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
24 24 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 04/23 3:54 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint RE: Seaman,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Centennial Bank. DMG Consulting & Development, Inc served on 4/17/2025, response/answer due 5/8/2025. (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 service Notice of Action/Publication Tue 04/22 4:34 PM
Notice of Action/Publication filed by Centennial Bank. M/Y Olympus answer/written defenses due by 4/16/2025. (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 04/22 12:03 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re19 Notice of Striking. Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. Per DE19 Notice, the filer is requesting to seal or remove docket entries. Filer is instructed to Motion the Court for those reliefs. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
21 21 1 pgs order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Tue 04/22 11:19 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to M/Y Olympus her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, boats, furniture, equipment, rigging, freights, and all other necessary appurtenances, etc. - Motions Terminated:18 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 4/22/2025. (pc)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice (Other) Mon 04/21 10:56 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE of Filing Exhibit by Centennial Bank (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit B - Redacted First Preferred Ship Mortgage
19 19 notice Notice of Striking Mon 04/21 10:20 PM
NOTICE of Striking (1) Docket Entry 1-6, Exhibit B to the Complaint and (2) Docket Entry 5-2, Exhibit B to the Complaint by Centennial Bank (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
18 18 3 pgs motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Mon 04/21 9:48 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default Against as to M/Y Olympus by Centennial Bank.(Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C
17 17 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Mon 04/21 2:13 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint RE: Seaman,, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Centennial Bank. GCYC SIRENA 88 LLC served on 4/17/2025, response/answer due 5/8/2025. (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 17, 2025
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Thu 04/17 11:22 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER Requiring Status Update. On or before April 29, 2025 , the parties shall file a status update regarding the progress of this action. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 4/17/2025. (koy)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
15 15 service Warrant for Arrest In Rem Returned Thu 04/03 11:34 AM
WARRANT FOR ARREST IN REM Returned Executed as to M/Y Olympus, her engines, machinery, tackle, apparel, boats, furniture, equipment, rigging, freights, and all other necessary appurtenances, etc. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
14 14 2 pgs service Warrant In Rem Issued Fri 03/21 2:22 PM
Warrant for Arrest In Rem Issued as to M/Y Olympus. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 3/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc) Modified per DE 12 on 3/21/2025 (pc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
13 13 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Custodian Thu 03/20 6:02 PM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (koy)
Related: [-]
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem Thu 03/20 5:59 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (koy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
11 11 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 03/19 5:02 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring Plaintiff Centennial Bank to submit Proposed Orders for its Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem and for Emergency Consideration, [ECF No. 6], and its Motion to Appoint Frank Kups as Custodian Substitute, [ECF No. 7]. Pursuant to S.D. Fla. CM/ECF Administrative Procedure 3(I)(6), Centennial Bank shall email its respective Proposed Orders to ruiz@flsd.uscourts.gov in Word format on or before March 20, 2025 . Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 3/19/2025. (koy)
Related: [-]
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/19 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Filing of Certificate of Exigent Circumstances by Centennial Bank (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Consent and Indemnification Agreement Wed 03/19 1:43 PM
Consent and Indemnification Agreement by Centennial Bank (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Appoint Custodian Wed 03/19 1:40 PM
MOTION to Appoint Frank Kups as Custodian Substitute by Centennial Bank. Responses due by 4/2/2025.(Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
6 6 motion Issuance of Warrant in rem Wed 03/19 1:02 PM
MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and for Emergency Consideration by Centennial Bank.(Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B
5 5 14 pgs notice Notice (Other) Wed 03/19 11:37 AM
NOTICE of Filing of Verified Complaint by Centennial Bank (Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 4 pgs Exhibit Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit Exhibit F
2 2 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Wed 03/19 10:21 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 3/19/2025 in the amount of $ 405.00, receipt number FLS300096. (vt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
10 10 3 pgs service Summons Issued Wed 03/19 2:56 PM
Summons Issued as to DMG CONSULTING & DEVELOPMENT INC., GCYC SIRENA 88 LLC, Dragos Sprinceana. (pc)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Wed 03/19 11:27 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 03/19 10:53 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Documents Improperly Arranged. The Filer did not properly attach the Civil Cover Sheet AND the COMPLAINT is not included. The filer is instructed to file the Complaint within 24 hours. Future filings must comply with the CM/ECF Civil Case Opening Guide. (pc) Modified on 3/19/2025 (jc)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs cmp Complaint RE: Seaman Tue 03/18 5:51 PM
First Complaint RE: Seaman against All Defendants. CLERKS NOTICE: Please be advised that this Seamans Action filed pursuant to 28 USC 1916 defers prepayment of the filing fee until the termination of the case, filed by Centennial Bank d/b/a Shore Premier Finance.(Zeher, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s) Summons to be issued, GCYC SIRENA 88 LLC,
Att: 2 2 pgs Summon(s) Summons to be issued, DRAGOS SPRINCEANA,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Summons to be issued, DRAGOS SPRINCEANA