Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Catherine D Perry
Case #: 4:25-cv-00336
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 5:29 AM CDT
Defendant
Dyna Flex, LTD.
Represented By
Michael J. Hickey
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Bridget Hoy
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Defendant
Ortho Solutions, LC
Represented By
Michael J. Hickey
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Bridget Hoy
Lewis Rice Llc - St. Louis
contact info
Plaintiff
Bay Materials, LLC
Represented By
Glenn E. Davis
Hepler Broom Llc - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
17 17 order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Wed 04/30 11:18 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Dyna Flex, LTD., Ortho Solutions, LC.(Hickey, Michael) filed by Ortho Solutions, LC, Dyna Flex, LTD. ; ORDERED GRANTED.. (Dyna Flex, LTD. answer due 5/15/2025; Ortho Solutions, LC answer due 5/15/2025.). Signed by Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/30/2025. (LCR)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 04/29 2:03 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Dyna Flex, LTD., Ortho Solutions, LC.(Hickey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, April 24, 2025
15 15 order CJRA Order Thu 04/24 1:37 PM
CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
14 14 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 04/15 10:03 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Defendant's motion for extension of time [ECF No.10 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The deadline for Defendants to file their answer or other responsive pleading is extended to April 30, 2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 4/15/25. (JAB)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 14, 2025
13 13 misc Entry of Appearance Mon 04/14 2:43 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Bridget Hoy for Defendants Dyna Flex, LTD., Ortho Solutions, LC. (Hoy, Bridget)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 04/14 2:39 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ortho Solutions, LC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Hickey, Michael)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Mon 04/14 2:28 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Dyna Flex, LTD.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Hickey, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Mon 04/14 2:24 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint,,, by Defendants Dyna Flex, LTD., Ortho Solutions, LC.(Hickey, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
misc Letter Magistrate Consent Non-Compliance Mon 04/14 11:24 AM
Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Bay Materials, LLC to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/18/2025. (LNJ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/25 11:59 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bay Materials, LLC. (Davis, Glenn)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/25 11:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bay Materials, LLC. Ortho Solutions, LC served on 3/25/2025, answer due 4/15/2025. (Davis, Glenn)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency (Teams & Cape) Tue 03/25 11:49 AM
NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bay Materials, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: The attorney's signature on the signature block must match the name of the e-filer. This is an informational notice and no further action is needed at this time. All future filings must be in compliance with this rule. (TLR)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 03/25 11:35 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Bay Materials, LLC. Dyna Flex, LTD. served on 3/25/2025, answer due 4/15/2025. (Bousquet, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
5 5 misc Report re:Patent/Trademark/Copyright Wed 03/19 4:04 PM
REPORT to Commissioner of filing or determination of an action regarding patent. (JBH)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Notification Wed 03/19 4:08 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. 2 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Glenn E. Davis. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click[LINK:here] for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible.[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (JBH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
4 4 misc Disclosure Statement (Disclosure of Organizational Interests) Tue 03/18 3:11 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bay Materials LLC, Straumann Manufacturing, Inc., Straumann Manufacturing, Inc., Straumann Holding AG, SIX Swiss Exchange.. (Davis, Glenn)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Notice of Process Server Tue 03/18 3:06 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bay Materials LLC Process Server: St. Charles County Sheriff (Davis, Glenn)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Notice of Process Server Tue 03/18 3:05 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Bay Materials LLC Process Server: St. Charles County Sheriff (Davis, Glenn)
Related: [-]
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 03/18 3:03 PM
COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against defendant Dyna Flex, LTD., Ortho Solutions LC with receipt number AMOEDC-11148215, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Bay Materials LLC.(Davis, Glenn)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Exhibit U,
Att: 22 Exhibit V,
Att: 23 Exhibit W,
Att: 24 Exhibit X,
Att: 25 Summons Dyna Flex,
Att: 26 Summons Ortho Solutions,
Att: 27 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 28 Original Filing Form