Nebraska District Court
Judge:Brian C Buescher
Referred: Jacqueline M Deluca
Case #: 8:25-cv-00197
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Case in other court:District Court of Douglas County, CI25-993
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 4:14 AM CDT
Defendant
Lincoln National Life Insurance, Company
Represented By
Jaskirat K. Strandquest
Baird, Holm Law Firm
contact info
Steven D. Davidson
Baird, Holm Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Dale Woita
Represented By
Richard J. Schicker
Schicker Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 82 minutes ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
8 8 order Order on Motion to Extend Wed 04/09 4:35 PM
TEXT ORDER granting7 Defendant's Motion for Additional Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within 20 days after notice of the Court's ruling on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand3 . Ordered by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca. (KLM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Tue 04/08 11:53 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading by Attorney Jaskirat K. Strandquest on behalf of Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance, Company.(Strandquest, Jaskirat)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
6 6 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 Thu 04/03 1:48 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 identifying Corporate Parent Lincoln National Corporation for Lincoln National Life Insurance, Company. by Attorney Jaskirat K. Strandquest on behalf of Defendants Lincoln National Life Insurance, Company, Lincoln National Corporation.(Strandquest, Jaskirat)
Related: [-]
5 5 oth_doc Brief Thu 04/03 11:29 AM
BRIEF in opposition to MOTION to Remand 3 by Attorney Jaskirat K. Strandquest on behalf of Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance, Company.(Strandquest, Jaskirat)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 21, 2025
4 4 notice Notice Regarding Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 03/21 12:16 PM
TEXT NOTICE REGARDING CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Deputy Clerk as to Defendant Lincoln National Life Insurance, Company. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1, non-governmental corporate parties are required to file Corporate Disclosure Statements (Statements). The parties shall use the form Corporate Disclosure Statement, available on the Web site of the court at http://www.ned.uscourts.gov/forms/. If you have not filed your Statement, you must do so within 15 days of the date of this notice. If you have already filed your Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(MPM)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Remand Fri 03/21 9:59 AM
MOTION to Remand by Attorney Richard J. Schicker on behalf of Plaintiff Dale Woita.(Schicker, Richard)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
2 2 oth_evt Assignment of Judges Wed 03/19 8:42 AM
TEXT NOTICE OF JUDGES ASSIGNED: Judge Brian C. Buescher and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline M. DeLuca assigned. In accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(2), the parties are notified that, if all parties consent, a magistrate judge may conduct a civil action or proceeding, including a jury or nonjury trial, subject to the courts rules and policies governing the assignment of judges in civil cases. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 73; NEGenR 1.4. (LRM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 03/18 3:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL against Dale D. Woita from Douglas County District Court, Case number CI 25-993 ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANEDC-5279773) with attached state court pleadings, by Attorney Jaskirat K. Strandquest on behalf of Lincoln National Life Insurance Company(Strandquest, Jaskirat)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B