Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Patricia Tolliver Giles
Referred: William B Porter
Case #: 1:25-cv-00480
Nature of Suit463 Immigration - Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Federal)
Case Filed:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Saturday May 03, 2025 7:28 AM EDT
Petitioner
Badar Khan Suri
Represented By
Nermeen Saba Arastu
Main Street Legal, Inc. Cuny School Of Law
contact info
Hassan Minhaj Ahmad
The Hma Law Firm PLLC
contact info
Jessica Myers Vosburgh
Center For Constitutional Rights
contact info
Astha S Pokharel
Center For Constitutional Rights
contact info
Vishal Mahendra Agraharkar
Aclu Of Virginia
contact info
Samah Sissay
Center For Constitutional Rights
contact info
Geri Greenspan
Aclu Of Virginia
contact info
Baher Azmy
Center For Constitutional Rights
contact info
Eden Brooke Heilman
Aclu Of Virginia
contact info
Diana Shamas
Center For Constitutional Rights
contact info
Sophia Leticia Gregg
American Civil Liberties Union Of Virginia
contact info
Respondent
Pamela Bondi
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
David J. Byerley
Doj-Civ
contact info
Yamileth Davila
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Spavins
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Christian James Cooper
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Jeffrey Crawford
in his official capacity as Warden of Farmville Detention Center Farmville Detention Center 508 Waterworks Road
Farmville, VA 23901
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
Respondent
Russell Hott
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
David J. Byerley
Doj-Civ
contact info
Yamileth Davila
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Spavins
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Christian James Cooper
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Donald Trump
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
David J. Byerley
Doj-Civ
contact info
Yamileth Davila
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Spavins
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Christian James Cooper
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Todd Lyons
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
David J. Byerley
Doj-Civ
contact info
Yamileth Davila
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Spavins
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Christian James Cooper
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Kristi Noem
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
David J. Byerley
Doj-Civ
contact info
Yamileth Davila
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Spavins
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Christian James Cooper
Doj-Usao
contact info
Respondent
Marco Rubio
Represented By
Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni
Doj-Civ
contact info
David J. Byerley
Doj-Civ
contact info
Yamileth Davila
Doj-Civ
contact info
Elizabeth Anne Spavins
United States Attorney'S Office (alexandria)
contact info
Christian James Cooper
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Friday, May 09, 2025
61 61 MOTION for Telephonic Access to Hearing by Badar Khan Suri. (Greenspan, Geri)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
60 60 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Transfer Case Tue 05/06 6:58 PM
ORDERED that Respondents' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer Venue (Dkts. 24, 25) are DENIED; it is further ORDERED that the Court will set a hearing on Petitioner's Motion to Compel Respondents to Return Petitioner to this District (Dkt. 5) and Petitioner's Motion for Release on Bond (Dkt. 20) for May 14, 2025, at 10:00 a.m.; and it is further ORDERED that the parties shall file any supplemental filings related to Petitioner's Motion to Compel Respondents to Return Petitioner to this District (Dkt. 5) and Petitioner's Motion for Release on Bond (Dkt. 20) to the extent necessary to address any additional claims in the Amended Petition and Complaint (Dkt. 34) on or before May 12, 2025, at 12:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 05/06/2025. (jlan)
Related: [-]
59 59 29 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 05/06 6:56 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION in re24 MOTION to Dismiss and25 MOTION to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles on 05/06/2025. (jlan)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 05/06 6:59 PM
Motion Hearing set for 5/14/2025 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 801 before District Judge Patricia Tolliver Giles as to5 MOTION to compel respondents to return petitioner to this district and20 MOTION for Release on Bond. (jlan)
Related: [-]
Saturday, May 03, 2025
58 58 respoth Response Other Sat 05/03 4:12 PM
Response to57 NOTICE,55 Order, filed by Badar Khan Suri. (Agraharkar, Vishal)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
57 57 notice Notice (other) Fri 05/02 4:38 PM
NOTICE by Pamela Bondi, Russell Hott, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, Marco Rubio, Donald Trump re55 Order, of Submission(Cooper, Christian)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration
56 56 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 05/02 12:48 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Benjamin Scott-Sharoni on behalf of Pamela Bondi, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott, Todd Lyons, Kristi Noem, Marco Rubio, Donald Trump (Scott-Sharoni, Tom)
Related: [-]